This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2019 at 08:01:19 (UTC).

Ziadeh v. Comenity Bank et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 a Property - Personal Property Fraud case was filed by Ziadeh against Comenity Bank in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01623

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan E. Schwab

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Issa G. Ziadeh

Greencastle, PA 17225

Defendants

Comenity Bank

Sterling Jewelers Inc.

Farukh Bhutta

Comenity LLC

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Summons Packet

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Comenity Bank and Comenity LLC and Address Update filed by Issa G. Ziadeh (aaa) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Issa G. Ziadeh. Sterling Jewelers Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (pjr) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

4 #1

Summons Packet

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO PLAINTIFF VIA U.S. MAIL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

3 #1

285 Service Packet with IFP Notice

#3

(#3) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER informing the parties of their briefing and other responsibilities.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/19/19. (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(dmn) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#2

(#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (dmn) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 111024383), filed by Issa G. Ziadeh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Comenity Bank and Comenity LLC and Address Update filed by Issa G. Ziadeh (aaa) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Issa G. Ziadeh. Sterling Jewelers Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (pjr) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Receipt of payment from Law Offices of Issa G. Ziadeh in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 9/19/2019. Receipt number 111024383 processed by rweida. (tp) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO PLAINTIFF VIA U.S. MAIL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (dmn) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER informing the parties of their briefing and other responsibilities.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/19/19. (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(dmn) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (dmn) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 111024383), filed by Issa G. Ziadeh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmn) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.