This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:03:52 (UTC).

Zheng v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Zheng filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allyne R. Ross and Vera M. Scanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06874

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Allyne R. Ross

Referral Judge

Vera M. Scanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yu Yan Zheng

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Mou Chien Lim

United States of America

Jin Feng Yan

Defendant and Cross Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ernest A. Spivak

Attorney at Caesar and Napoli, P.C.

Woolworth Building, 233 Broadway, Suite 2348

New York, NY 10279

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

Andres Javier Camacho

Attorney at James G. Bilello and Associates

100 Duffy Avenue, Ste. 500

Hicksville, NY 11714

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 2/10/2020 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 2/6/2020. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/23/2020. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against United States of America by Jin Feng Yan, Mou Chien Lim. (Camacho, Andres) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Mou Chien Lim, United States of America, Jin Feng Yan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Yu Yan Zheng (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Spivak, Ernest) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Yu Yan Zheng filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12132980 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Yu Yan Zheng. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Spivak, Ernest) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Initial Conference set for 2/10/2020 will begin at 11:30 AM (not 12:00 PM) in Courtroom 13A South before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/3/2020. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 2/10/2020 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 2/6/2020. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/23/2020. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against United States of America by Jin Feng Yan, Mou Chien Lim. (Camacho, Andres) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Mou Chien Lim, United States of America, Jin Feng Yan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Yu Yan Zheng (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Spivak, Ernest) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Yu Yan Zheng filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12132980 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Yu Yan Zheng. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Spivak, Ernest) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less