Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:03:25 (UTC).

Zheng v. McAleenan et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Zheng filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against McAleenan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nina Gershon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04836

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nina Gershon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shu Cheng Zheng

Defendants

Gregory Richardson

Kevin McAleenan

US Atty General William Barr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Chien

7 Mott Street, Suite 500

New York, NY 10013

Defendant Attorney

Dara A Olds

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

271 Cadman Plaza East

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice for the Court's endorsement by William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Gregory Richardson (Olds, Dara) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Dara A Olds on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Olds, Dara) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Gregory Richardson, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Nina Gershon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against William Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Gregory Richardson filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11785842 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Shu Cheng Zheng. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chien, David) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Atty General William Barr is a litigant