This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2022 at 07:53:09 (UTC).

Zheng v. Garland et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 Zheng filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Garland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-09225

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wen Zheng

Respondents

Merrick B. Garland

Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas

Director UR MENDOZA JADDOU

Field Office Dir. Tim Houghton

Alejandro Mayorkas

Ur Mendoza Jaddou

Tim Houghton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hui Yang

Attorney at The Law Offices of Hui Yang

276 Fifth Avenue, Suite 704Suite 704

New York, NY 10001

Respondent Attorney

Michael James Byars

U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny (Chambers Street)86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on January 12, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 1/12/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/12/2021) (va) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#13

RESTRICTED

#14

RESTRICTED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Merrick B. Garland, Tim Houghton, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Byars, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James Byars on behalf of Merrick B. Garland, Tim Houghton, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas..(Byars, Michael) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on January 12, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Initial Conference set for 1/12/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 11/12/2021) (va) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Yang, Hui) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou..(jgo) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tim Houghton..(jgo) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merrick B. Garland..(jgo) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alejandro Mayorkas..(jgo) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Hui Yang. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Merrick B. Garland; Alejandro Mayorkas; UR MENDOZA JADDOU; Tim Houghton. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Hui Yang to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated October 1, 2020;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Wen Zheng..(Yang, Hui) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tim Houghton, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Wen Zheng..(Yang, Hui) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrick B Garland, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Wen Zheng..(Yang, Hui) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alejandro Mayorkas, re: #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. Document filed by Wen Zheng..(Yang, Hui) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Yang, Hui) Modified on 11/9/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Merrick B. Garland, Tim Houghton, UR MENDOZA JADDOU, Alejandro Mayorkas (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25305267).Document filed by Wen Zheng..(Yang, Hui) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Field Office Directo Kimberly D Dean is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael James Byars