This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2021 at 10:04:03 (UTC).

Zhang v. Dragon Capital Group, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Zhang filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Dragon Capital Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank D. Whitney and David S. Cayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00154

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Xuejun Zhang

Defendants

Stephen L. Kirkland

Snellville, GA 30078

Premier Investments & Financial Services Group, LLC

Dragon Capital Group, LLC

FXTrade ZH, LP

Alexander C. Cheng

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ross Robert Fulton

Attorney at Rayburn, Cooper & Durham, P.A.

227 W. Trade St., Suite 1200

Charlotte, NC 28202

Natalie E. Kutcher

Attorney at Rayburn Cooper & Durham, P.A.

227 W. Trade Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Defendant Attorneys

Tamara A Seelman

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

555 Seventeenth Street, Ste. 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Allison J. Becker

Attorney at Yates, McLamb & Weyher LLP

421 Fayetteville St, Suite 1200

Raleigh, NC 27601

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

#22

#20

#18

#5

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

#3

2 #4

Summons

2 #3

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

1 #3

Exhibit C

#1

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Xuejun Zhang. Replies due by 6/14/2021 (Fulton, Ross) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss by Xuejun Zhang. Replies due by 6/14/2021 (Fulton, Ross) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Xuejun Zhang. Replies due by 6/14/2021 (Fulton, Ross) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dragon Capital Group, LLC, FXTrade ZH, LP.(Becker, Allison) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Dragon Capital Group, LLC, FXTrade ZH, LP. (Becker, Allison) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Stay Discovery by Dragon Capital Group, LLC, FXTrade ZH, LP. Responses due by 6/7/2021 (Becker, Allison). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Dragon Capital Group, LLC, FXTrade ZH, LP. (Becker, Allison) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Dragon Capital Group, LLC, FXTrade ZH, LP. Responses due by 6/7/2021 (Becker, Allison). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss by Dragon Capital Group, LLC, FXTrade ZH, LP. (Becker, Allison) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Dismiss by Dragon Capital Group, LLC, FXTrade ZH, LP. Responses due by 6/7/2021 (Becker, Allison) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie E. Kutcher on behalf of Xuejun Zhang (Kutcher, Natalie) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Dragon Capital Group, LLC answer due 5/24/2021; FXTrade ZH, LP answer due 5/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/27/2021. (mek) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Dragon Capital Group, LLC, FXTrade ZH, LP. (Becker, Allison). Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Allison J. Becker on behalf of Dragon Capital Group, LLC, FXTrade ZH, LP (Becker, Allison) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Xuejun Zhang. Dragon Capital Group, LLC served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/3/2021; FXTrade ZH, LP served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/3/2021; Stephen L. Kirkland served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021; Premier Investments & Financial Services Group, LLC served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fulton, Ross) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Alexander C. Cheng. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(js) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketClerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (js) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4978014), filed by Xuejun Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Fulton, Ross) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ross Robert Fulton