This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:06:29 (UTC).

Zepeda v. City of Chicago

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Zepeda filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against City of Chicago. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03806

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diana Zepeda

Defendants

City of Chicago

Chicago Board of Education

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel F. Handler

Attorney at Attorney at Law

One East Wacker Drive, Suite 510

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Notice of Filing Notice of Filing

#6

(#6) AMENDED complaint by Diana Zepeda against City of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Handler, Joel) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Diana Zepeda by Joel F. Handler (Handler, Joel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diana Zepeda as to City of Chicago on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Handler, Joel) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Diana Zepeda; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15905581. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Handler, Joel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Joint status report due by 8/9/2019. Status hearing set for 8/15/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/13/2019:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Chicago Board of Education. (acm, ) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED complaint by Diana Zepeda against City of Chicago (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Handler, Joel) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Diana Zepeda as to City of Chicago on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Handler, Joel) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant City of Chicago (daj, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Joint status report due by 8/9/2019. Status hearing set for 8/15/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 6/13/2019:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Diana Zepeda by Joel F. Handler (Handler, Joel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Diana Zepeda; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15905581. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Handler, Joel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.