This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/16/2022 at 11:26:20 (UTC).

Zenith Lighting Holdings, Inc. v. Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Zenith Lighting Holdings, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Embry J. Kidd and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01064

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zenith Lighting Holdings, Inc.

Defendant

Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kelly Corcoran

Attorney at Ball Janik, LLP

201 E Pine St Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801

Patrick Joseph Button

Attorney at Ball Janik, LLP

201 E. Pine St., Suite 600

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

Brett Carey

Attorney at Rumberger, Kirk & Caldwell, PA

300 S Orange Ave Ste 1400

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

State Court Complaint

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #3

State Court Other Documents

1 #4

Exhibit A - Notice of Service of Process

1 #5

Exhibit B - Sworn Proof of Loss

1 #6

Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company.(Carey, Brett) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/24/2022. (YG) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent AGCS International Holding B.V. for Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Carey, Brett) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Carey, Brett) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Notice of a Related Action, #5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, by Zenith Lighting Holdings, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Charles Herington for Zenith Lighting Holdings, Inc.. (Corcoran, Kelly) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Zenith Lighting Holdings, Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Corcoran, Kelly) Modified text on 7/11/2022 (LDJ). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Button, Patrick) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#11

(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/5/2022 Discovery due by 4/3/2023 Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2023 Pretrial statement due by 10/12/2023 All other motions due by 9/28/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/19/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/20/2023 Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 11/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/31/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/1/2022. (YG) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on January 10, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. before Kimberly Sands. (Carey, Brett) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on January 10, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. before Kimberly Sands. (Carey, Brett) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • Docket(#12) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (SPM) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/5/2022 Discovery due by 4/3/2023 Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2023 Pretrial statement due by 10/12/2023 All other motions due by 9/28/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/19/2022 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/20/2023 Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 11/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 A before Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/31/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/1/2022. (YG) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Button, Patrick) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Remark: Docs. #5 and #7 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/11/2022. (EP) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Zenith Lighting Holdings, Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Corcoran, Kelly) Modified text on 7/11/2022 (LDJ). (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Notice of a Related Action, #5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement, by Zenith Lighting Holdings, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Charles Herington for Zenith Lighting Holdings, Inc.. (Corcoran, Kelly) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Carey, Brett) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent AGCS International Holding B.V. for Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Carey, Brett) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/24/2022. (YG) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company.(Carey, Brett) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-01064-RBD-EJK. (APV) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court, 9th Circuit, Orange County, FL, case number 2022-CA-003550 filed in State Court on 04/21/2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19685821 filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Exhibit A - Notice of Service of Process, #5 Exhibit B - Sworn Proof of Loss, #6 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carey, Brett) Modified on 6/17/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Firemans Fund Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brett Matthew Carey