This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/02/2020 at 08:48:45 (UTC).

Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated v. Knight Ag Sourcing LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Knight Ag Sourcing LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00456

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated

Defendants

Knight Ag Sourcing LLC

SPI Solar Incorporated

Knight Holding Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Louis Sklar

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothberger Christie LLP - Tucson Office

1 S Church Ave., Ste. 2000

Tucson, AZ 85701-1611

Defendant Attorney

Bryan F Murphy

Attorney at Burch & Cracchiolo PA

702 E Osborn Rd., Ste. 200

Phoenix, AZ 85014

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER: The parties' Joint Certification #16 is granted. The parties shall exchange their Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses no later than May 18, 2020. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/23/2020. (LMR) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#16

(#16) REPORT of Joint Certification to Defer Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Program Responses by 14 Days by Plaintiff Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

15 #1

Attachments

#15

(#15) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 5/29/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#14

(#14) *Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPI Solar Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent SPI Energy Company Limited for SPI Solar Incorporated . (Murphy, Bryan) *Modified to add corporate party on 4/6/2020 (EJA). (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Knight Holding Corporation. (Murphy, Bryan) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Knight Ag Sourcing LLC. (Murphy, Bryan) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#11

(#11) *ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Knight Ag Sourcing LLC, SPI Solar Incorporated, Knight Holding Corporation.(Murphy, Bryan) *Modified to add filers on 4/6/2020 (EJA). (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#10

(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Project; Preliminary Order upon SPI Solar, Inc. on March 6, 2020. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#9

(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons; Complaint; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project; Notice, Consent and Order of Reference-Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge; Preliminary Order upon Knight Ag Sourcing, LLC on March 6, 2020. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#8

(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated: Affidavit of Process re: Summons; Complaint; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project; Notice, Consent and Order of Reference-Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge; Preliminary Order upon Knight Holding Corporation on March 6, 2020. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

7 #1

Attachments

#7

(#7) PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

6 #2

Summons

6 #1

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibits

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15023519 filed by Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated. (Submitted by Jeffrey L Skylar) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(EJA) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER: The parties' Joint Certification #16 is granted. The parties shall exchange their Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses no later than May 18, 2020. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/23/2020. (LMR) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPORT of Joint Certification to Defer Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Program Responses by 14 Days by Plaintiff Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 5/29/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) *Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPI Solar Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent SPI Energy Company Limited for SPI Solar Incorporated . (Murphy, Bryan) *Modified to add corporate party on 4/6/2020 (EJA). (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Knight Holding Corporation. (Murphy, Bryan) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Knight Ag Sourcing LLC. (Murphy, Bryan) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) *ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Knight Ag Sourcing LLC, SPI Solar Incorporated, Knight Holding Corporation.(Murphy, Bryan) *Modified to add filers on 4/6/2020 (EJA). (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Project; Preliminary Order upon SPI Solar, Inc. on March 6, 2020. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons; Complaint; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project; Notice, Consent and Order of Reference-Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge; Preliminary Order upon Knight Ag Sourcing, LLC on March 6, 2020. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated: Affidavit of Process re: Summons; Complaint; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Notice to Parties-Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project; Notice, Consent and Order of Reference-Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge; Preliminary Order upon Knight Holding Corporation on March 6, 2020. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Knight Ag Sourcing LLC, Knight Holding Corporation, SPI Solar Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(EJA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15023519. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-00456-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (EJA) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (EJA) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent ZHI, Corporate Parent National Federation of Agricultural Cooperative Associations (Zen-Noh Japan) for Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated. (Submitted by Jeffrey L Sklar) (EJA) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(EJA) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15023519 filed by Zen-Noh Hay Incorporated. (Submitted by Jeffrey L Skylar) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(EJA) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan F Murphy