This case was last updated from PACER on 08/22/2021 at 07:26:29 (UTC).

Michael Zeleny v. Tyler C. Burge et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Michael Zeleny filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Tyler C Burge. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05103

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Zeleny

Defendants

DOES 1 through 20

The Alonzo Church Publication Project

Massachusetts Institute of Technology

Tyler C. Burge

MIT Press

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Damion D D Robinson

Attorney at Affeld Grivakes LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2460

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David W Affeld

Attorney at Affeld Grivakes LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 2460

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Keith J Wesley

Attorney at Browne George Ross O'Brien Annaguey and Ellis LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Serli Polatoglu

Attorney at Browne George Ross O'Brien Annaguey and Ellis LLP

2121 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Rhonda Stewart Goldstein

Attorney at The Regents of the University of California

1111 Franklin Street 8Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

13 #1

Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time for Tyler Burge to Respond to

13 #13

Main Document

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR TYLER BURGE TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court ORDERS that the Stipulation requesting that Defendant Tyler Burge's time to respond to the initial Complaint be extended to 9/2/2021 #13 is GRANTED. (gk) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tyler C. Burge, (Goldstein, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 2, 2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Tyler C. Burge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time for Tyler Burge to Respond to Initial Complaint)(Attorney Rhonda Stewart Goldstein added to party Tyler C. Burge(pty:dft))(Goldstein, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY AND MIT PRESS TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court ORDERS that the Stipulation requesting that Defendants Massachusetts Institute of Technology and MIT Press' time to respond to the initial Complaint be extended to 9/2/2021 #9 is GRANTED. (gk) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Serli Polatoglu on behalf of Defendants MIT Press, Massachusetts Institute of Technology (Attorney Serli Polatoglu added to party MIT Press(pty:dft), Attorney Serli Polatoglu added to party Massachusetts Institute of Technology(pty:dft))(Polatoglu, Serli) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants MIT Press, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, (Wesley, Keith) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 2, 2021 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants MIT Press, Massachusetts Institute of Technology. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party MIT Press(pty:dft), Attorney Keith J Wesley added to party Massachusetts Institute of Technology(pty:dft))(Wesley, Keith) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (tf) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Tyler C. Burge, MIT Press, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, The Alonzo Church Publication Project. (ghap) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Michael Zeleny. (Robinson, Damion) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael Zeleny, (Robinson, Damion) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Zeleny. (Robinson, Damion) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31513307 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Michael Zeleny. (Attorney Damion D D Robinson added to party Michael Zeleny(pty:pla))(Robinson, Damion) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W Affeld

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Damion D D Robinson