This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/25/2022 at 08:36:34 (UTC).

ZELENSKI v. AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 ZELENSKI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Madeline Cox Arleo and Jessica S. Allen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02392

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

Referral Judge

Jessica S. Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOROTHY ZELENSKI

Defendant

AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARY S. GRAIFMAN

Attorney at KANTROWITZ, GOLDHAMER & GRAIFMAN, PC

135 Chestnut Ridge Road, Suite 200

Montvale, NJ 07645

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#3) Letter from Eric R. Fish re: Plaintiff's Letter Requesting Consolidation and Appointment of Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel and Interim Class Counsel. (FISH, ERIC) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Civil Actions No. 22-1757, 22-1878, 22-2392, and 22-2642, are hereby consolidated for all purposes. The Clerk shall establish a Docket for the Actions under Civil Action No. 22-1757 (MCA)(JSA). etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/10/2022. (qa, ) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • Docket***Civil Case Terminated. (qa, ) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Civil Actions No. 22-1757, 22-1878, 22-2392, and 22-2642, are hereby consolidated for all purposes. The Clerk shall establish a Docket for the Actions under Civil Action No. 22-1757 (MCA)(JSA). etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/10/2022. (qa, ) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter from James E. Cecchi Enclosing Proposed Stipulation and Order Regarding Consolidation, Appointment Of Interim Class Counsel and Scheduling. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter from Eric R. Fish re: Plaintiff's Letter Requesting Consolidation and Appointment of Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel and Interim Class Counsel. (FISH, ERIC) (Entered: 05/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter from James E. Cecchi to the Hon. Madeline Cox Arleo regarding Consolidation of Related Actions and Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CECCHI, JAMES) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (ak, ) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AMERICAN FINANCIAL RESOURCES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13364128) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DOROTHY ZELENSKI. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GRAIFMAN, GARY) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Financial Resources Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Steven Graifman Esq.