This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2022 at 08:47:35 (UTC).

David Zeil v. Valencia Manu et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 David Zeil filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Valencia Manu. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00195

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Zeil

Defendants

Valencia Manu

Southwest Airlines Co.

Doe

Does 3 to 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neil S Steiner

Attorney at Steiner and Libo PC

11845 West Olympic Boulevard Suite 910W

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Defendant Attorney

Todd Christopher Worthe

Attorney at Worthe Hanson and Worthe ALC

1851 East First Street Suite 860

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference filed by PLAINTIFF David Zeil. (Steiner, Leonard) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/14/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2022 at 9:00 am. (sw) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co..(Worthe, Todd) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by defendant Southwest Airlines Co... (Worthe, Todd) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co.. (Worthe, Todd) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co., identifying Plaintiff, David Zeil; Defendant, Valencia Manu aka Sally Valencia Manu aka Sally Manu; Defendant, Southwest Airlines Co., and Insurance Carrier, United States Aviation Underwriters, Inc., as Manager of United States Aircraft Insurance Group. (Worthe, Todd) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

1 #6

Exhibit F - POS re Defendant Manu

1 #5

Exhibit E - Statement of Damages

1 #4

Exhibit D - Notice of Service of Process re Southwest Airlines Co.

1 #3

Exhibit C - Amendment to Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Amendment to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference filed by PLAINTIFF David Zeil. (Steiner, Leonard) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/14/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2022 at 9:00 am. (sw) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff David Zeil, upon Defendant Valencia Manu served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021 in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by mail and acknowledgment of receipt of service. Submitted with Attachment 6 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT as to Defendant Southwest Airlines Co. amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff David Zeil. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Doe 2 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Southwest Airlines Co. Filed in State Court on 11/29/2021 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT as to Defendant Valencia Manu aka Sally Valencia Manu, aka Valencia Sally Manu amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff David Zeil. Upon the filing of the complaint, the plaintiff being ignorant of the true name of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of Doe 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be Filed in State Court on 9/3/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 1/12/2022 (car). (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 100, inclusive, filed by Plaintiff David Zeil. Filed in State Court on 5/14/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co..(Worthe, Todd) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by defendant Southwest Airlines Co... (Worthe, Todd) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co.. (Worthe, Todd) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Southwest Airlines Co., identifying Plaintiff, David Zeil; Defendant, Valencia Manu aka Sally Valencia Manu aka Sally Manu; Defendant, Southwest Airlines Co., and Insurance Carrier, United States Aviation Underwriters, Inc., as Manager of United States Aircraft Insurance Group. (Worthe, Todd) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV18145 Receipt No: ACACDC-32595696 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Southwest Airlines Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amendment to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Amendment to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Service of Process re Southwest Airlines Co., #5 Exhibit E - Statement of Damages, #6 Exhibit F - POS re Defendant Manu) (Attorney Todd Christopher Worthe added to party Southwest Airlines Co.(pty:dft))(Worthe, Todd) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd Christopher Worthe