This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2021 at 07:23:52 (UTC).

Zeigler v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 Zeigler filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are R Bryan Harwell and Molly H Cherry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:21-CV-03222

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R Bryan Harwell

Referral Judge

Molly H Cherry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Haley Zeigler

Defendant

Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Interested Parties

Social Security Administrative Record

US Attorney - Social Security Noticing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Townsend McChesney

Attorney at McChesney and McChesney PC

930 South Pine Street

Spartanburg, SC 29302

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • Docket(#4) Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Standing Order 3:21-mc-00212-RBH signed by Chief Judge R. Bryan Harwell, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summonses shall issue. Set Answer Deadline - Social Security Complaint: Answer due from Commissioner of the Social Security Administration on 4/4/2022. (tsim, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Haley Zeigler. Response to Motion due by 10/18/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Molly H Cherry. (tsim, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration filed by Haley Zeigler. Service due by 1/3/2022. (tsim, ) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Security Noticing is a litigant

Latest cases where Social Security Administrative Record is a litigant