This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2021 at 09:22:09 (UTC).

Zeidman v. Freshly Picked, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 Zeidman filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Freshly Picked, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01129

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hindi R. Zeidman

Defendant

Freshly Picked, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John C. Phillips, Jr.

Attorney at Phillips, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 N. Broom St

Wilmington, DE 19806

Megan C. Haney

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

Defendant Attorney

Karen Jacobs

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to November 1, 2021 filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshly Picked, LLC answer due 11/1/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/28/2021. (kmd) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to November 1, 2021 - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Jacobs, Karen) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Andrew M. Moshos) by Freshly Picked, LLC (Moshos, Andrew) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to October 1, 2021 filed by Freshly Picked, LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshly Picked, LLC answer due 10/1/2021. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/26/2021. (nmf) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER Complaint to October 1, 2021 - filed by Freshly Picked, LLC. (Moshos, Andrew) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hindi R. Zeidman. Freshly Picked, LLC served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (Haney, Megan) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Freshly Picked, LLC on 8/4/2021. (twk) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE 48, 330. (twk) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Freshly Picked, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3671525.) - filed by Hindi R. Zeidman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen Jacobs