This case was last updated from PACER on 03/21/2020 at 08:31:03 (UTC).

Zegar v. Kraft Foods Nabisco

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 Zegar filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Kraft Foods Nabisco. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles P. Kocoras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00451

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles P. Kocoras

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kamal Zegar

Kraft Foods Nabisco nka and dba Mondelez International

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

L. Steven Platt

Attorney at Robbins, Salomon and Patt, Ltd.

180 N. Lasalle, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60601-2808

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kamal Zegar. Kraft Foods Nabisco waiver sent on 1/22/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Platt, L.) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Platt, L.) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#2

(#2) AMENDED complaint by Kamal Zegar against Kraft Foods Nabisco nka and dba Mondelez International (Platt, L.) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kamal Zegar; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16635723.(Platt, L.) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kamal Zegar. Kraft Foods Nabisco waiver sent on 1/22/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Platt, L.) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Platt, L.) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AMENDED complaint by Kamal Zegar against Kraft Foods Nabisco nka and dba Mondelez International (Platt, L.) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Kamal Zegar; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16635723.(Platt, L.) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KRAFT FOODS GLOBAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer L. Steven Platt