This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:35:03 (UTC).

Zavanna, LLC v. Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Zavanna, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Warren Alloy Valve Fitting Company, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine M. Arguello and S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01658

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zavanna, LLC

Defendant

Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brad W. Breslau

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor-Denver

707 17Th Street, Suite 3100

Denver, CO 80202-3400

Defendant Attorney

Christine Kirchner

Attorney at Chamberlain Hrdlicka White Williams & Aughtry-Houston

1200 Smith Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Zavanna, LLC. (Breslau, Brad) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#32

(#32) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Zavanna, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Breslau, Brad) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#26

(#26) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

23 #1

*Restricted*

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

17 #2

Exhibit 1B - Packing slip

14 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of Gene A. Mundy

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#10

(#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Benjamin J. Williams for Zavanna, LLC. Attorney Joseph A. Wetch, Jr. terminated. (BG) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zavanna, LLC. (Breslau, Brad) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#7

(#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Benjamin J. Williams for Zavanna, LLC. Attorney Joseph A. Wetch, Jr. terminated. (BG) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Zavanna, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/11/2019. (rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Zavanna, LLC. (Breslau, Brad) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#34) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/23/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #32 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-01658-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Zavanna, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Breslau, Brad) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint Attorney Christine Kirchner added to party Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P.(pty:dft) by Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P..(Kirchner, Christine) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Defendant Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P. (Navetta, Kevin) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Defendant Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P. (Kirchner, Christine) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • (#28) MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/1/2019. Consent Form due by 8/1/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/10/19. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brad W. Breslau on behalf of Zavanna, LLCAttorney Brad W. Breslau added to party Zavanna, LLC(pty:pla) (Breslau, Brad) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, ) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Benjamin J. Williams for Zavanna, LLC. Attorney Joseph A. Wetch, Jr. terminated. (BG) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zavanna, LLC. Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P. served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019 (Breslau, Brad) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zavanna, LLC. (Breslau, Brad) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph Wetch by Zavanna, LLC. (Williams, Benjamin) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P. filed by Zavanna, LLC.(Breslau, Brad) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • (#5) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland and referring to Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer the presiding judge assigned to the case by Chief Judge Daniel L. Hovland.(rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Zavanna, LLC. (rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Zavanna, LLC. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 4/11/2019. (rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P. (rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 119000752) filed by Zavanna, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rh) [Transferred from North Dakota on 6/7/2019.] (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zavanna, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Warren Alloy Valve & Fitting Company, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brad W. Breslau