This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2020 at 07:46:31 (UTC).

Zarubina v. Jalbert

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 Zarubina filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Jalbert. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-MC-00315

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Appellant

Elena Zarubina

Debtor

F-Squared Investment Management, LLC, et al.

Appellee

Craig Jalbert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Julia Bettina Klein

Attorney at Klein LLC

919 N. Market Street, Suite 600

Wilmington, DE 19801

Appellee Attorneys

Jason Anthony Gibson

Attorney at The Rosner Law Group LLC

824 Market Street, Suite 810

Wilmington, DE 19801

Frederick Brian Rosner

Attorney at The Rosner Law Group LLC

824 Market Street, Suite 810

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Appeal by Elena Zarubina. (Klein, Julia) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

2 #6

COS

2 #5

Exhibit E

2 #4

Exhibit D

2 #3

Exhibit C

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) Appellee's BRIEF by Craig Jalbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 COS)(Gibson, Jason) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

1 #4

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal Sheet

1 #3

Memorandum

1 #2

Order on Appeal

1 #1

Joint Notice of Appeal

#1

(#1) Defendants' Joint MOTION for Leave to Allow interlocutory Appeal - filed by Elena Zarubina. (Attachments: #1 Joint Notice of Appeal, #2 Order on Appeal, #3 Memorandum, #4 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • CASE CLOSED (ntl) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Appeal by Elena Zarubina. (Klein, Julia) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Appellee's BRIEF by Craig Jalbert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 COS)(Gibson, Jason) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-mc-00315-LPS through 1:19-mc-00318-LPS and 1:19-mc-00320-LPS through 1:19-mc-00334-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • Remark : Case submitted for routine judicial assignment. (kmd) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Defendants' Joint MOTION for Leave to Allow interlocutory Appeal - filed by Elena Zarubina. (Attachments: #1 Joint Notice of Appeal, #2 Order on Appeal, #3 Memorandum, #4 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where F-Squared Investment Management LLC, et al is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frederick Brian Rosner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason A. Gibson