This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/12/2022 at 08:49:22 (UTC).

Zaras v. Merchants Credit Guide Co.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 Zaras filed an Other lawsuit against Merchants Credit Guide Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03653

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robyn Zaras

Defendant

Merchants Credit Guide Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John P Carlin

Attorney at Suburban Legal Group

1305 Remington Road, Suite C

Schaumburg, IL 60173

Defendant Attorneys

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Ruddy S-A. Abam

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson Llp

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Robyn Zaras by John P Carlin (Carlin, John) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#3

(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 8/29/2021, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Co. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Co. by Ruddy S-A. Abam (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Co. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Unopposed) (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#7

(#7) (Unopposed) NOTICE of Motion by Ruddy S-A. Abam for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #6 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/16/2022 at 11:00 AM. (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court grants Defendant's unopposed motion to extend time #6 and strikes the 8/16/22 Notice of Motion date. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by 8/19/22. The 8/29/22 status report deadline stands. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robyn Zaras (Carlin, John) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the filing of the notice of voluntary dismissal #9 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. Absent reinstatement on or before 10/5/2022, this case will be dismissed with prejudice without further order of the Court. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the filing of the notice of voluntary dismissal #9 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. Absent reinstatement on or before 10/5/2022, this case will be dismissed with prejudice without further order of the Court. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 08/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robyn Zaras (Carlin, John) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court grants Defendant's unopposed motion to extend time #6 and strikes the 8/16/22 Notice of Motion date. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by 8/19/22. The 8/29/22 status report deadline stands. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (Unopposed) NOTICE of Motion by Ruddy S-A. Abam for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #6 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 8/16/2022 at 11:00 AM. (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Co. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Unopposed) (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Co. by Ruddy S-A. Abam (Abam, Ruddy) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Co. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 8/29/2021, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Merchants Credit Guide Co. (emc, ) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (kra, ) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kra, ) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Robyn Zaras by John P Carlin (Carlin, John) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Robyn Zaras; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19649912. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carlin, John) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merchants Credit Guide Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M. Schultz