This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 11:11:56 (UTC).

Zaragoza v. Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 Zaragoza filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Judith G. Dein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-10650

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Judith G. Dein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosalinda Zaragoza

West Wareham, MA 02576

Defendants

Mike Viano

Debbie Bowles

Anna Mezzano

Manny Santos

Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc.

Nancy Costa

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#8

(#8) Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER re Service of Process entered. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Zaragoza wishes to pursue this action, she must, no later than Monday, May 20, 2019, either (1) pay the $400 filing fee; or (2) file a completed Application and include therewith (on a separate page if necessary) an explanation as to how she is provided with the basic necessities of life and any other relevant information concerning her financial circumstances. Failure to comply with this directive may result in dismissal of the action. [Order mailed to plaintiff on 4/29/2019 with Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs.] (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#3

(#3) General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rosalinda Zaragoza.(Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc., Mike Viano, Debbie Bowles, Nancy Costa, Anna Mezzano, Manny Santos filed by Rosalinda Zaragoza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet)(Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER re Service of Process entered. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Documents submitted by Rosalinda Zaragoza. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 1BST074258 for #1 Complaint, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, (Coppola, Katelyn) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Zaragoza wishes to pursue this action, she must, no later than Monday, May 20, 2019, either (1) pay the $400 filing fee; or (2) file a completed Application and include therewith (on a separate page if necessary) an explanation as to how she is provided with the basic necessities of life and any other relevant information concerning her financial circumstances. Failure to comply with this directive may result in dismissal of the action. [Order mailed to plaintiff on 4/29/2019 with Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs.] (PSSA, 3) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rosalinda Zaragoza.(Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Ocean Spray Cranberries, Inc., Mike Viano, Debbie Bowles, Nancy Costa, Anna Mezzano, Manny Santos filed by Rosalinda Zaragoza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet)(Caruso, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ocean Spray Cranberries Inc Welfare Benefits Plan is a litigant