This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/07/2020 at 08:39:49 (UTC).

Zara Gemilyan v. Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 Zara Gemilyan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08207

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zara Gemilyan

Defendants

Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Theodore Richard Tang

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert Starr

23901 Calabasas Road Suite 2072

Calabasas, CA 91302

Robert L Starr

Attorney at Law Office of Robert Starr APC

23901 Calabasas Road Suite 2072

Calabasas, CA 91302

Adam Morris Rose

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert Starr APC

23901 Calabasas Road Suite 2072

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant Attorneys

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Andrew K Stefatos

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #12 filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#21

(#21) DECLARATION of Andrew Stefatos re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,,,,,,,,, 14 OSC filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

12 #6

Proposed Order

12 #5

Exhibit 3

12 #4

Exhibit 2

12 #3

Exhibit 1

12 #2

Declaration of Bertha Anguiano

12 #1

Declaration of Kate S. Lehrman

#12

(#13) Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #12 filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (esa) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#5

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Jury Demand #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on September 8, 2020. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#4

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Jury Demand #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on September 8, 2020. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#3

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Jury Demand #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on September 8, 2020. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#2

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Jury Demand #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on September 8, 2020. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Jury Demand #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on September 8, 2020. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #12 filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC. (Stefatos, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DECLARATION of Andrew Stefatos re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,,,,,,,,, 14 OSC filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 8/16/21. (rfi) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 11/9/2021 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Docket(#18) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DECLARATION of Robert L. Starr re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,,,,,,,,,, 14 filed by Plaintiff Zara Gemilyan. (Tang, Theodore) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Amended ; estimated length of trial 3, filed by Plaintiff Zara Gemilyan.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Schedule)(Tang, Theodore) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #12 filed by Plaintiff Zara Gemilyan. (Tang, Theodore) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS. This overburdened court and its staff do not have time to communicate repeatedly with counsel in an effort to have them follow this Courts rules and orders. Counsel have failed to comply with the Courts Order Setting Scheduling Conference and the attached Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates in one or more respects. For example, counsel may have (1) failed to file a Joint 26(f) Report at all, (2) failed to provide all of the information required by the Order, (3) failed to attach a Schedule, or (4) failed to complete the Schedule properly. Counsel are ordered to show cause why each side should not be sanctioned in the amount of $500 for their failure to comply with the Order. Counsel whose signature appears on the Joint 26(f) Report must file a declaration stating who was (1) responsible for meeting with opposing counsel, (2) responsible for preparing and reviewing the Report and ensuring its accuracy and compliance with the Order, and (3) responsible for filing the Report. The declaration should state that persons name (only if the person is an attorney) and the persons position (partner, associate, paralegal, assistant, secretary, etc.). The declaration shall also state why the Report failed to comply with the Order. If no Report was filed, the declaration must state who was (1) responsible for calendaring the date for meeting with counsel and filing the Report, (2) responsible for responsible for meeting with opposing counsel, and (3) responsible for filing the Report. The same information as to name and position must be provided as well as an explanation as to why no Report was filed. In addition, the parties are ordered to review the Courts Order Setting Scheduling Conference and the attached Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates carefully, and to provide a Report and a Schedule that provides specific dates for all of the relevant items in the Schedule. The dates must comply with the time frames in the weeks before trial column and the required days of the week: a Monday (not a holiday) for the pretrial conference and last day for hearing motions and a Tuesday (not a holiday) for trial. The declarations, Report, and Schedule are due within five Court days. The filing of compliant declarations, Report, and Schedule will be a sufficient response to this Order to Show Cause. The scheduling conference date is vacated. The parties are urged to conduct themselves in a professional manner and to make every effort to agree on dates. Further failures to comply with this courts rules and orders, including the rules and orders of the Central District, will result in sanctions against one or both parties. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #12 filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (esa) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC. (filed in state court 9/4/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Zara Gemilyan, upon Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC served on 8/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 1) (esa) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC, filed by plaintiff Zara Gemilyan. (filed in state court 8/6/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 4) (esa) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Jury Demand #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on September 8, 2020. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC.. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV29693 Receipt No: ACACDC-27985633 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Kate S Lehrman added to party Rolls-Royce Motor Cars NA, LLC(pty:dft))(Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROLLS-ROYCE MOTOR CARS NA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew K Stefatos

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacqueline Bruce Chinery