This case was last updated from PACER on 11/20/2021 at 08:36:27 (UTC).

Zappone v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 Zappone filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-17251

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diana Zappone

Defendants

IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC

PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

LUZENAC AMERICA INC

COSMETIC TOILETRY AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION

Unknown Business and/or Corporations

JOHN DOES

JANE DOES

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward A. Jazlowiecki

Attorney at Jazlowiecki & Jazlowiecki, LLC

P.O. Box 9333

Forestvile, CT 06010

Defendant Attorneys

J. Patrick Kennedy

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Two Seaport Lane, Seaport East

Boston, MA 02210

THOMAS T. LOCKE

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

975 F Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1454

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss by PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (LOCKE, THOMAS) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#11

(#11) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (km) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#10

9 #1

*Restricted*

9 #9

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#8

7 #1

Removal Standing Order

7 #7

Main Document

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/18/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, ) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss by PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (LOCKE, THOMAS) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (km) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal, ) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:21-cv-01187. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to District of New Jersey Signed by Clerk John W. Nichols MDL Panel on 09/17/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Personal Care Products Council, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Personal Care Products Council, #3 Notice of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases filed by Personal Care Products Council, #2 Notice of No Pending Motions filed by Personal Care Products Council Signed by Clerk on 09/03/2021. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 09/03/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2021. Discovery due by 3/5/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/9/2022. Signed by Clerk on 09/03/2021.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketJudge Alfred V. Covello added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Personal Care Products Council. (Kennedy, J.) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Personal Care Products Council Notice of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases (Kennedy, J.) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Personal Care Products Council Notice of No Pending Motions (Kennedy, J.) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Personal Care Products Council from Connecticut Superior Court in New Britain, case number HHB-CV21-6068159-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-6635208, filed by Personal Care Products Council. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Kennedy, J.) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC") is a litigant

Latest cases where PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL is a litigant

Latest cases where COSMETIC, TOILETRY, AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant