Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2019 at 07:38:02 (UTC).

ZapFraud, Inc. v. Proofpoint, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 ZapFraud, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Proofpoint, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01691

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZapFraud, Inc.

Defendant

Proofpoint, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Brian E. Farnan

Attorney at Farnan LLP

919 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Wen Xue

Jonas R. McDavit

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Fry

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

William M. Logan

Karen Elizabeth Keller

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Katherine K. Vidal

Michael R. Rueckheim

Nathan Roger Hoeschen

Attorney at Shaw Keller LLP

1105 North Market Street, 12Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to move, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 3, 2019 - filed by Proofpoint, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

10 #1

Exhibit A & B

9 #2

Exhibit 2

9 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

(#9) STIPULATION regarding First Amended Complaint by ZapFraud, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine Vidal, Michael R. Rueckheim and William M. Logan - filed by Proofpoint, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#7

SO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 1, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Proofpoint, Inc. answer due 11/1/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/24/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZapFraud, Inc.. Proofpoint, Inc. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#6

SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonas R. McDavit and Wen Xue filed by ZapFraud, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/18/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by ZapFraud, Inc. (myr) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 10,277,628 B1. (myr) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Proofpoint, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2727186.) - filed by ZapFraud, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • Case Reassigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01688-CFC, 1:19-cv-01689-CFC, 1:19-cv-01691-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, plead or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint to December 3, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Proofpoint, Inc. answer due 12/3/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/1/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (and proposed order) to move, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to December 3, 2019 - filed by Proofpoint, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Proofpoint, Inc. - filed by ZapFraud, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(dlw) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #9 Stipulation Regarding First Amended Complaint (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Proofpoint, Inc. answer to First Amended Complaint due 11/18/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/17/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION regarding First Amended Complaint by ZapFraud, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Katherine K. Vidal, Michael R. Rueckheim, William M. Logan for Proofpoint, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (kmd) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine Vidal, Michael R. Rueckheim and William M. Logan filed by Proofpoint, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/7/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Katherine Vidal, Michael R. Rueckheim and William M. Logan - filed by Proofpoint, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to November 1, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Proofpoint, Inc. answer due 11/1/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/24/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Wen Xue for ZapFraud, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonas R. McDavit and Wen Xue filed by ZapFraud, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/18/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonas R. McDavit and Wen Xue - filed by ZapFraud, Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01687-MN, 1:19-cv-01688-MN, 1:19-cv-01689-MN, 1:19-cv-01690-MN, 1:19-cv-01691-MN (rjb) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZapFraud, Inc.. Proofpoint, Inc. served on 9/11/2019, answer due 10/2/2019. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Proofpoint, Inc. on 9/10/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (myr) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by ZapFraud, Inc. (myr) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 10,277,628 B1. (myr) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Proofpoint, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 311-2727186.) - filed by ZapFraud, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROOFPOINT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Mitchell Logan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Vidal

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID M. FRY