This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/29/2021 at 10:49:26 (UTC).

Zapata v. Lifetime Fitness LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Zapata filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Lifetime Fitness LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00548

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santiago Zapata

Defendants

Lifetime Fitness LLC

Unknown Parties

Lifetime Fitness Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Anthony Nix

Attorney at Browne Law Group

366 N Gilbert Rd., Ste. 202

Gilbert, AZ 85234

Byron F Browne

Attorney at Browne Law Group

366 N Gilbert Rd., Ste. 202

Gilbert, AZ 85234

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew David Kleifield

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Robert Charles Ashley

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012

 

Court Documents

#7

6 #1

Remand Letter

#6

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Receipt of Remand Letter and Order (received by Maricopa County Superior Court on 4/21/21). (SST) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's April 2, 2021 order (Doc. #4 ) and Defendant's withdrawal of its notice of removal (Doc. #5 ), IT IS ORDERED that this action is remanded to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/16/21. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (SST) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) *MOTION to Remand to State Court Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Removal Filed on March 29, 2021 re: #1 Notice of Removal by Lifetime Fitness Incorporated . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ashley, Robert) *Modified to add motion type and to correct reference to related document on 4/19/2021 (MFR). (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER that removing Defendant shall file an amended notice of removal properly stating a jurisdictional basis for this action no later than 4/16/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendant fails to file an amended notice of removal by 4/16/2021, the Clerk of Court shall remand this action to state court without further notice. Signed by Judge Dominic W. Lanza on 4/02/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19300300. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-548-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lifetime Fitness Incorporated. (Kleifield, Matthew) (ARC) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-091010. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19300300 filed by Lifetime Fitness Incorporated. (Kleifield, Matthew) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(ARC) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lifetime Fitness Inc. d/b/a Life Time Fitness is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Charles Ashley(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew David Kleifield