This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2019 at 07:59:16 (UTC).

Zapata v. BP America Production Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 Zapata filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP America Production Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carlos E. Mendoza, Thomas B. Smith and Embry J. Kidd. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-01023

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carlos E. Mendoza

Referral Judges

Thomas B. Smith

Embry J. Kidd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oscar Zapata

Defendants

BP America Production Company

BP Exploration & Production Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig Downs

Attorney at Downs Law Group, PA

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Vanessa Elizabeth Diaz

Attorney at Downs Law Group, PA

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Nathan Lee Nelson

Attorney at Downs Law Group, PA

3250 Mary St Ste 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133-5232

Gabriel Hawa

Attorney at Downs Law Group

Suite 307, 3250 Mary Street

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Defendant Attorneys

Don Keller Haycraft

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Kevin Michael Hodges

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Catherine Pyune McEldowney

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Sarah Anne Long

Attorney at McDonald Toole Wiggins, PA

111 N Magnolia Ave - Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

Francis Morton McDonald, Jr.

Attorney at McDonald Toole Wiggins, PA

111 N Magnolia Ave - Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

Courtney Michelle King

Attorney at McDonald Toole Wiggins, PA

111 N Magnolia Ave - Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (McDonald, Francis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

34 #1

Exhibit A

#34

(#34) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc.. re #33 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McDonald, Francis) Modified on 7/19/2019 (DMA). (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#33

(#33) ORDER to show cause as to why this case should not be dismissed for a failure to comply with the filing of a case management report as to BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc., Oscar Zapata. Show Cause Response due by 7/23/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/16/2019. (DJD) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#32

(#32) ORDER granting #31 Motion to Withdraw, Attorney Vanessa Elizabeth Diaz terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/25/2019. (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

31 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw

#31

(#31) Consent MOTION for Vanessa E. Diaz to withdraw as attorney by Oscar Zapata. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Hawa, Gabriel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#30

(#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Hawa on behalf of Oscar Zapata (Hawa, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#29

(#29) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #21 Interested persons order by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP P.L.C. for BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc... (McDonald, Francis) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#5

(#9) ORDER GARNTING #5 Motion to Compel: Oral argument was conducted in the matters listed below on February 27, 2019, regarding defendants' 148 motions to compel disclosures from plaintiffs. IT IS ORDERED that, no later than March 29, 2019, defendants' counsel must file and notice for submission a motion to fix the amount of reasonable fees and costs, supported by proof including a verified report in accordance with Local Rule 54.2. Accordingly, defendants' motions to compel disclosures and for attorney's fees and costs are granted in the following cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/28/2019. (mmv) [Transferred from laed on 6/3/2019.] (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from laed on 6/3/2019.] (Entered: 11/26/2018)

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from laed on 6/3/2019.] (Entered: 10/30/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-Notice of Intent not to Mediate

#1

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from laed on 6/3/2019.] (Entered: 11/26/2018)

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (McDonald, Francis) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • (#35) Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:19-CV-1023-ORL-41-EJK. Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (LMM) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc.. re #33 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McDonald, Francis) Modified on 7/19/2019 (DMA). (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) ORDER to show cause as to why this case should not be dismissed for a failure to comply with the filing of a case management report as to BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc., Oscar Zapata. Show Cause Response due by 7/23/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/16/2019. (DJD) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER granting #31 Motion to Withdraw, Attorney Vanessa Elizabeth Diaz terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/25/2019. (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Consent MOTION for Vanessa E. Diaz to withdraw as attorney by Oscar Zapata. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(Hawa, Gabriel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Hawa on behalf of Oscar Zapata (Hawa, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #21 Interested persons order by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP P.L.C. for BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc... (McDonald, Francis) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #20 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc.. Related case(s): yes (McDonald, Francis) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File and for Withdrawal of Craig T. Downs. Attorney Craig T. Downs representation is TERMINATED, and the Clerk shall REMOVE his name from the CM/ECF filing list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 6/19/2019. (EC) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on Febrauary 27, 2019 before Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr.. Court Reporter/Recorder Toni Tusa, Telephone number 504-589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2019. (rsg) [Transferred from laed on 6/3/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER GARNTING #5 Motion to Compel: Oral argument was conducted in the matters listed below on February 27, 2019, regarding defendants' 148 motions to compel disclosures from plaintiffs. IT IS ORDERED that, no later than March 29, 2019, defendants' counsel must file and notice for submission a motion to fix the amount of reasonable fees and costs, supported by proof including a verified report in accordance with Local Rule 54.2. Accordingly, defendants' motions to compel disclosures and for attorney's fees and costs are granted in the following cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/28/2019. (mmv) [Transferred from laed on 6/3/2019.] (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 2/27/2019 re #5 Defendants' 148 Motions to Compel Disclosures. SUBMITTED. A separate order consistent with the oral rulings at the hearing will be issued. (mmv) [Transferred from laed on 6/3/2019.] (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from laed on 6/3/2019.] (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the submission date for defendant's #5 motions to compel currently set for submission on February 20, 2019, is hereby CONTINUED to February 27, 2019, and oral argument on all of these motions will be conducted on FEBRUARY 27, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr., 500 Poydras Street, Hale Boggs Building, Room B-421, New Orleans, Louisiana. Counsel for all affected plaintiffs and defendant must appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/13/2019.(mmv) [Transferred from laed on 6/3/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Compel Production of Initial Disclosure Materials, to Continue Deadline for Venue Filing, and for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission, #5 Proposed Order)(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from laed on 6/3/2019.] (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from laed on 6/3/2019.] (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from laed on 6/3/2019.] (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from laed on 6/3/2019.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7195900) filed by Oscar Zapata. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice of Intent not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Craig Downs added to party Oscar Zapata(pty:pla).(Downs, Craig) [Transferred from laed on 6/3/2019.] (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COURTNEY MICHELLE KING

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR