This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/22/2022 at 06:01:44 (UTC).

Zamudio v. Aerotek, Inc., et al.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 Zamudio filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Aerotek, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jennifer L. Thurston and BakersfieldMJ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01673

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Jennifer L. Thurston

BakersfieldMJ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diana Vega Zamudio

Defendants

Aerotek, Inc.,

Caterpillar Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edwin Pairavi

Attorney at Pairavi Law, P.C.

1875 Century Park East, Suite 480

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Michael S. Kun

Attorney at Epstein Becker and Green

1925 Century Park East, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Andrew S. Rosenman

Attorney at Mayer Brown, LLP

71 S. Wacker Dr.

Chicago, IL 60606

Sean A. Flores

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

350 S. Grand Avenue, 25Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Supplemental Declaration of Horacio Ramirez in Support of Defendant Aerotek, In

19 #19

Main Document

18 #1

Declaration of Diana Vega Zamudio

18 #18

Main Document

16 #5

Proposed Order Granting Defendant Aerotek, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitrat

16 #4

Defendant Aerotek, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion

16 #3

Declaration of Thomasina Barefield in Support of Defendant Aerotek, Inc.'s

16 #2

Declaration of Michael S. Kun in Support of Defendant Aerotek, Inc.'s Motio

16 #1

Declaration of Horacio Ramirez in Support of Defendant Aerotek, Inc.'s Moti

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) ORDER DENYING #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/14/2022. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#13

(#13) STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/26/2022. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#12

(#12) REPLY by Diana Vega Zamudio re #4 Motion to Remand, #10 Opposition to Motion. (Pairavi, Edwin) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

10 #3

Exhibit 2

10 #2

Exhibit 1

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Declaration of Edwin Pairavi

4 #4

Main Document

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY by Aerotek, Inc., re #18 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Horacio Ramirez in Support of Defendant Aerotek, Inc.'s Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action)(Kun, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) OPPOSITION by Diana Vega Zamudio to #16 Motion to Compel,,,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diana Vega Zamudio)(Pairavi, Edwin) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to the undersigned's standing order and Local Rule 230(g), the recently filed motion to compel arbitration and stay #16 will be decided on the papers. No hearing will be calendared. The hearing date selected by the movant will nonetheless serve to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). The parties are further informed that as a result of the judicial resource emergency described in this Court's standing order re judicial emergency, more than 100 motions remain under submission in the caseload recently re-assigned to the undersigned. Although the Court has begun the process of working through this significant backlog, it may still be many months until the motion in this matter is resolved. The Court reiterates that magistrate judge consent may alleviate some of the delays caused by the resource emergency signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on March 8, 2022. (Munoz, I) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration and Stay Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Aerotek, Inc.,. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Horacio Ramirez in Support of Defendant Aerotek, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action, #2 Declaration of Michael S. Kun in Support of Defendant Aerotek, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action, #3 Declaration of Thomasina Barefield in Support of Defendant Aerotek, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action, #4 Defendant Aerotek, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action, #5 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Aerotek, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action)(Kun, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER DENYING #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/14/2022. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/28/2022: In light of the pending motion to remand, the Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2022 is CONTINUED to 5/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file a joint scheduling report at least one week prior to the conference. (Text Only Entry)(Hall, S) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/26/2022. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY by Diana Vega Zamudio re #4 Motion to Remand, #10 Opposition to Motion. (Pairavi, Edwin) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Caterpillar Inc. in re #10 Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rosenman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) OPPOSITION by Caterpillar Inc. to #4 Motion to Remand,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew S. Rosenman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Rosenman, Andrew) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is reassigned from *Unassigned DJ* to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for all further proceedings. Documents filed in this case shall continue to include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(SKO)* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate is appointed. (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(SKO)* (Gonzalez, R) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ADJUST BRIEFING DEADLINES FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on January 4, 2022. (Munoz, I) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Adjusting Briefing Deadlines for Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Caterpillar Inc.. (Rosenman, Andrew) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The parties are informed that pursuant to Local Rule 302, Standing Order Re Judicial Emergency [2-3], and the Order of Clarification [2-4], the recently-filed motion to remand #4 will be heard and decided by the undersigned. No hearing will be calendared, and the matter will be decided on the papers. The hearing date of January 18, 2022 serves only to set the opposition and reply filing deadlines. A written decision will issue as soon as is practicable in light of the Court's extraordinarily heavy caseload. signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on December 21, 2021. (Munoz, I) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to REMAND by Diana Vega Zamudio. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2022 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edwin Pairavi, #2 Proposed Order)(Pairavi, Edwin) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kun, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 JLT Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Clarification Order, #5 Consent Form, #6 VDRP) (Rivera, O) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Kern, case number BCV-21-102423 by DOES 1 through 50, Caterpillar Inc., Aerotek, Inc.,. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9936286) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Declaration of Horacio Ramirez in Support of Notice of Removal, #8 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Notice of Removal, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Certificate of Service)(Rosenman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AEROTEK INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Caterpillar, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Rosenman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Kun