This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2023 at 06:38:38 (UTC).

Zamora et al v. Daniel Defense, LLC et al

Case Summary

On February 22, 2023, Christina Zamora, individually and as next friend of M.Z.; Ruben Zamora, individually and as next friend of M.Z.; and Jamie Torres, individually and as next friend of K.T. (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Molly Thomas-Jensen of Everytown Law and Blas H. Delgado of Law Offices of Blas Delgado, P.C., filed a civil rights action against Daniel Defense, LLC, Oasis Outback, LLC (“Oasis Outback”), the City of Uvalde, Uvalde Consolidated Independent School District (“UCISD”), Pedro “Pete” Arredondo (“Arredondo”), and others (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages for alleged negligence and violation of the Fourth and Fourteenth Amendments to the U.S. Constitution. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas, with Judge Lee Yeakel presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiffs alleged, “M.Z. woke up on May 24, 2022 excited for the day to come—it was awards day at Robb Elementary and she knew that she would receive several awards. Her father, Ruben Zamora, was going to take her to school that day. She planned to leave school after the awards ceremony to continue to spend time with him rather than stay at school.”

Plaintiffs further alleged, “Later that morning, both M.Z.’s parents, Ruben and Christina, looked on with pride as she received three awards—for Skills Mastered in Math, for participating in the Robotics Program, and for Excellence in the AB Honor Roll. M.Z. was very proud and excited to have her parents present at the awards ceremony.”

The plaintiffs also alleged, “On May 24, 2022, at around 11:30 a.m., Salvador Ramos walked into Robb Elementary in Uvalde, Texas, armed with a Daniel Defense DDM4 V7 rifle and carrying hundreds of rounds of ammunition. He entered a set of connected classrooms (Rooms 111 and 112) where he murdered 19 children and two teachers and wounded at least 17 other children.”

The plaintiffs further alleged, “M.Z. and K.T. were in classroom 112. M.Z. was shot repeatedly, and very nearly died. She had to be airlifted to San Antonio. Her parents spent two months sleeping in her hospital room. She has undergone over sixty surgeries, and she still faces a long road to recovery. K.T. was hit by shrapnel. K.T. knew that she needed to pretend to be dead to survive, so she lay in blood with her eyes open because she saw that her dead and dying classmates had their eyes open. Both K.T. and M.Z. live with fear, anxiety, and distress. They, and all of Uvalde, will never be the same.”

The plaintiffs also alleged, “As a federal firearms licensee, Oasis Outback had a legal duty to not sell guns to prospective purchasers who it knew, or reasonably should have known, planned to use them to harm others. Given the many obvious red flags, it was a reckless dereliction of that duty for Oasis Outback to complete Ramos’ transactions.”

Additionally, the plaintiffs alleged, “M.Z. was shot in her chest, arm, and hand. It is a miracle that she did not die as she lay in classroom 112, bleeding, in pain, wondering if help would ever reach her classroom. Seventy-seven minutes of suffering, blood loss, and despair. Her parents searched for her at the school, at the hospital, and at the civic center in increasing terror that their daughter was among the wounded or the dead.”

Plaintiffs stated eight claims for relief, including for alleged negligence, negligence per se, negligent transfer, negligent sale, unlawful seizure in violation of the Fourth and Fourteenth Amendments pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983, violation of the Fourteenth Amendment’s Substantive Due Process by a State created danger and custodial relationship pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983, and Monell Liability for failure to train.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiffs requested an award for compensatory and punitive damages, with pre- and post-judgment interest.

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00196

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christina Zamora

Ruben Zamora

Jamie Torres

M. Z.

K. T.

Defendants

Daniel Defense, LLC

Pedro Arredondo

Jesus Suarez

Daniel Defense, Inc.

Oasis Outback, LLC

City of Uvalde

City of Uvalde Police Department

Uvalde Consolidated Independent School District

Uvalde County

Uvalde Consolidated Independent School District Police Department

Pete Arredondo

Mariano Pargas

J.J. Suarez

Daniel Coronado

Justin Mendoza

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Molly Thomas-Jensen

Blas Hernandez Delgado, Jr.

Defendant Attorneys

David McDonald Prichard

William Scott Helfand

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jamie Torres, Christina Zamora, Ruben Zamora. (Delgado, Blas) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#3

(#3) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Eric Tirschwell, Molly Thomas-Jensen, Ryan Gerber, and Laura Keeley. (cr5) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#4

(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter to David A. Neiman and Sarah M. Raisch. (cr5) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#5

(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to David Lopez. (cr5) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Pedro Arredondo, Joel Betancourt, City of Uvalde, Daniel Coronado, Daniel Defense, Inc., Daniel Defense, LLC, Max Dorflinger, Johnny Field, Christopher Kindell, Juan Maldonado, Justin Mendoza, Ruben Nolasco, Oasis Outback, LLC, Mariano Pargas, Jesus Suarez, Uvalde Consolidated Independent School District, Uvalde County, Emmanuel Zamora. (cr5) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruben Zamora, Christina Zamora, Jamie Torres as to Daniel Defense, LLC. Waiver sent on 2/27/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. (Delgado, Blas) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruben Zamora, Christina Zamora, Jamie Torres as to Daniel Defense, Inc.. Waiver sent on 2/27/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. (Delgado, Blas) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Defense, Inc. (Prichard, David) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Defense, LLC (Prichard, David) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#11

(#11) ORDER Transferring Case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Del Rio Division. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruben Zamora, Christina Zamora, K. T., Jamie Torres, M. Z. as to Oasis Outback, LLC. Waiver sent on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. (Delgado, Blas) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Molly Thomas-Jensen on behalf of K. T., Jamie Torres, M. Z., Christina Zamora, Ruben Zamora. Attorney Molly Thomas-Jensen added to party K. T.(pty:pla), Attorney Molly Thomas-Jensen added to party Jamie Torres(pty:pla), Attorney Molly Thomas-Jensen added to party M. Z.(pty:pla), Attorney Molly Thomas-Jensen added to party Christina Zamora(pty:pla), Attorney Molly Thomas-Jensen added to party Ruben Zamora(pty:pla) (Thomas-Jensen, Molly) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss by Daniel Coronado, Max Dorflinger, Justin Mendoza, Mariano Pargas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Helfand, William) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

14 #1

Proposed Order

4 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss by Daniel Coronado, Max Dorflinger, Justin Mendoza, Mariano Pargas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Helfand, William) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketThis case has been transferred to the Del Rio Division under case number 2:23-cv-17. All further pleadings should be filed under that case number. No further pleadings should be filed in the Austin case. (dm) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Molly Thomas-Jensen on behalf of K. T., Jamie Torres, M. Z., Christina Zamora, Ruben Zamora. Attorney Molly Thomas-Jensen added to party K. T.(pty:pla), Attorney Molly Thomas-Jensen added to party Jamie Torres(pty:pla), Attorney Molly Thomas-Jensen added to party M. Z.(pty:pla), Attorney Molly Thomas-Jensen added to party Christina Zamora(pty:pla), Attorney Molly Thomas-Jensen added to party Ruben Zamora(pty:pla) (Thomas-Jensen, Molly) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruben Zamora, Christina Zamora, K. T., Jamie Torres, M. Z. as to Oasis Outback, LLC. Waiver sent on 3/1/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. (Delgado, Blas) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Transferring Case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, Del Rio Division. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Defense, LLC (Prichard, David) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Daniel Defense, Inc. (Prichard, David) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruben Zamora, Christina Zamora, Jamie Torres as to Daniel Defense, Inc.. Waiver sent on 2/27/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. (Delgado, Blas) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ruben Zamora, Christina Zamora, Jamie Torres as to Daniel Defense, LLC. Waiver sent on 2/27/2023, answer due 4/28/2023. (Delgado, Blas) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Pedro Arredondo, Joel Betancourt, City of Uvalde, Daniel Coronado, Daniel Defense, Inc., Daniel Defense, LLC, Max Dorflinger, Johnny Field, Christopher Kindell, Juan Maldonado, Justin Mendoza, Ruben Nolasco, Oasis Outback, LLC, Mariano Pargas, Jesus Suarez, Uvalde Consolidated Independent School District, Uvalde County, Emmanuel Zamora. (cr5) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Hac Vice Letter to David Lopez. (cr5) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter to David A. Neiman and Sarah M. Raisch. (cr5) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Eric Tirschwell, Molly Thomas-Jensen, Ryan Gerber, and Laura Keeley. (cr5) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by K. T., Jamie Torres, M. Z., Christina Zamora, Ruben Zamora. (cr5) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (cr5) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jamie Torres, Christina Zamora, Ruben Zamora. (Delgado, Blas) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-17109546). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Christina Zamora, Jamie Torres, Ruben Zamora. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Delgado, Blas) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less