This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2020 at 13:39:26 (UTC).

Shahzad Zakir v. T-Mobile USA, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 Shahzad Zakir filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against T-Mobile USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00411

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shahzad Zakir

Defendants

T-Mobile USA, Inc

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul Andrew Campbell

Attorney at Hogie and Campbell Lawyers Inc

13522 Newport Avenue Suite 201

Tustin, CA 92780

Stephen W Hogie

Attorney at Hogie and Campbell Lawyers Inc

13522 Newport Avenue Suite 201

Tustin, CA 92780

Defendant Attorneys

Jonesh G Daryanani

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

Jill Louise Ripke

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1721

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Supplemental filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc identifying T-Mobile USA, Inc., a Delaware corporation, is a wholly-owned subsidiary of T-Mobile US, Inc., a Delaware corporation. T-Mobile US, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Daryanani, Jonesh) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#13

(#13) MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER RE SCHEDULING DATES by Judge James V. Selna: The Court has read and considered the parties Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following dates: Jury Trial March 30, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference March 15, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Discovery Cut-off December 16, 2021. Expert Discovery Cut-off February 26, 2021. Law and Motion Cut-off February 8, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. The Court orders that any settlement discussions shall be completed not later than December 11, 2020. (See document for further details and deadlines.) (es) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#11

(#11) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-9 days, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Ripke, Jill) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COURTS INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Daryanani, Jonesh) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#9

(#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 11:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 3/30/2020. (lb) (Entered: 03/08/2020)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE Demand for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Shahzad Zakir. an individual (Campbell, Paul) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shahzad Zakir. an individual (Campbell, Paul) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Daryanani, Jonesh) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc, identifying Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Plaintiff Shahzad Zakir. (Daryanani, Jonesh) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

1 #2

Declaration of Latisha Moss

1 #1

Declaration of Jill Ripke

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01126180 with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 02/28/2020, receipt number 25554064), filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jill Ripke, #2 Declaration of Latisha Moss) (Attorney Jonesh G Daryanani added to party T-Mobile USA, Inc(pty:dft))(Daryanani, Jonesh) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Supplemental filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc identifying T-Mobile USA, Inc., a Delaware corporation, is a wholly-owned subsidiary of T-Mobile US, Inc., a Delaware corporation. T-Mobile US, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Daryanani, Jonesh) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER [IN CHAMBERS] ORDER RE SCHEDULING DATES by Judge James V. Selna: The Court has read and considered the parties Rule 26(f) Report and sets the following dates: Jury Trial March 30, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Final PreTrial Conference March 15, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Discovery Cut-off December 16, 2021. Expert Discovery Cut-off February 26, 2021. Law and Motion Cut-off February 8, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. The Court orders that any settlement discussions shall be completed not later than December 11, 2020. (See document for further details and deadlines.) (es) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (lb) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-9 days, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Ripke, Jill) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF COURTS INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Daryanani, Jonesh) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 11:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 3/30/2020. (lb) (Entered: 03/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Demand for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Shahzad Zakir. an individual (Campbell, Paul) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shahzad Zakir. an individual (Campbell, Paul) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. [SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT I TO AS ATTACHMENT NO. I TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Shahzad Zakir, upon Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader-CSC-Person Authorized Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/10/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants T-Mobile USA, Inc., Does 1-50, filed by Plaintiff Shahzad Zakir. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/22/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Daryanani, Jonesh) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc, identifying Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Plaintiff Shahzad Zakir. (Daryanani, Jonesh) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01126180 with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 02/28/2020, receipt number 25554064), filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jill Ripke, #2 Declaration of Latisha Moss) (Attorney Jonesh G Daryanani added to party T-Mobile USA, Inc(pty:dft))(Daryanani, Jonesh) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jill Louise Ripke(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonesh G Daryanani