This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2020 at 13:40:34 (UTC).

Zakaria v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Zakaria filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against USAA Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl Barbier and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14690

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl Barbier

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hassan Zakaria

Defendants

Nicholas Cuttner

First Chicago Insurance Company

USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Nicholas J. Cuttner

Nicholas J Kuttner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dean Joseph Favret

Attorney at Favret, Demarest, Russo & Lutkewitte

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1400

New Orleans, LA 70112

Angela Cecelia Imbornone

Attorney at Favret, Demarest, Russo & Lutkewitte

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1400

New Orleans, LA 70112

Seth H. Schaumburg

Attorney at Favret, Demarest, Russo & Lutkewitte

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1400

New Orleans, LA 70112

Defendant Attorneys

James R. Nieset, Jr.

Attorney at Porteous, Hainkel & Johnson (New Orleans)

704 Carondelet St.

New Orleans, LA 70130-3774

Amanda Huling Aucoin

Attorney at Musgrave, McLachlan & Penn, LLC

1515 Poydras St., Suite 2380

New Orleans, LA 70112

Richard Todd Musgrave

Attorney at Musgrave, McLachlan & Penn, LLC

1515 Poydras St., Suite 2380

New Orleans, LA 70112

Magen Whitney Detillieu

Attorney at Musgrave, McLachlan & Penn, LLC

1515 Poydras St., Suite 2380

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#11

(#11) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Nieset, James) Modified text and corporate parent on 1/27/2020 (cg). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and Anthony J. Russo is withdrawn as counsel of record in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/23/2020. (cg) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Anthony J. Russo as Attorney by Hassan Zakaria. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schaumburg, Seth) Modified text on 1/13/2020 (clw). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Nicholas J Kuttner, USAA Casualty Insurance Company.Attorney James R. Nieset, Jr added to party Nicholas J. Cuttner(pty:dft).(Nieset, James) Modified link on 1/8/2020 (cg). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by First Chicago Insurance Company.Attorney Richard Todd Musgrave added to party First Chicago Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Musgrave, Richard) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint be extended up to and including January 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/30/2019. (cg) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#3

(#3) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Nicholas Cuttner, USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Nieset, James) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) Notice of Compliance by Nicholas Cuttner, USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nieset, James) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/23/2019) (cg). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th Judicial District Court, case number 801-145 (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Nicholas Cuttner, USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Attorney James R. Nieset, Jr added to party Nicholas Cuttner(pty:dft), Attorney James R. Nieset, Jr added to party USAA Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Nieset, James) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Carl Barbier. Jury Trial set for 2/22/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Carl Barbier. All discovery must be completed by 12/28/2020. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(cg) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Nieset, James) Modified text and corporate parent on 1/27/2020 (cg). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and Anthony J. Russo is withdrawn as counsel of record in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/23/2020. (cg) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2020 02:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (gec) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Anthony J. Russo as Attorney by Hassan Zakaria. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schaumburg, Seth) Modified text on 1/13/2020 (clw). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Nicholas J Kuttner, USAA Casualty Insurance Company.Attorney James R. Nieset, Jr added to party Nicholas J. Cuttner(pty:dft).(Nieset, James) Modified link on 1/8/2020 (cg). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by First Chicago Insurance Company.Attorney Richard Todd Musgrave added to party First Chicago Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Musgrave, Richard) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint be extended up to and including January 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/30/2019. (cg) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Nicholas Cuttner, USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Nieset, James) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketFiling fee received from Nicholas Cuttner: $ 400.00 Paid by Porteous Hainkel and Johnson Receipt no LAE059475 (go) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Compliance by Nicholas Cuttner, USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nieset, James) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/23/2019) (cg). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th Judicial District Court, case number 801-145 (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Nicholas Cuttner, USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Attorney James R. Nieset, Jr added to party Nicholas Cuttner(pty:dft), Attorney James R. Nieset, Jr added to party USAA Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Nieset, James) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Chicago Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dean Joseph Favret