This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/18/2020 at 11:41:56 (UTC).

Firooz Zahedi v. Miramax, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 Firooz Zahedi filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Miramax, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and Dolly M. Gee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04512

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Firooz Zahedi

Defendants

Torrid LLC

Miramax, LLC

Does 1-10, inclusive

Hot Topic, Inc.

Amazon.com, Inc.

Urban Outfitters, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott A Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Justin M Gomes

Attorney at Doniger Burroughs

603 Rose Avenue

Venice, CA 90291

Defendant Attorneys

Michael D Adams

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker LLP

611 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1931

Meredith Louise Williams

Attorney at Rutan and Tucker LLP

611 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1931

Sarah Gilmartin

611 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1931

Lauren Jennifer Fried

Attorney at Manatt Phelps and Phillips LLP

11355 West Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064

John Michael Gatti

Attorney at Manatt Phelps and Phillips LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Phillip A Medlin

Attorney at Hot Topic Inc

18305 San Jose Avenue

City Of Industry, CA 91748-1237

Robert T Cruzen

Attorney at Klarquist Sparkman LLP

121 Sw Salmon Street Suite 1600

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#26

25 #1

Proposed Order

#25

#24

23 #1

Proposed Order

#23

#22

21 #1

Proposed Order

#21

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FOR DEFENDANTS AMAZON.COM, INC. AND MIRAMAX, LLC by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Second Stipulation #25 , the Court orders that Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and and Miramax, LLC's time to respond to the Complaint is extended to on or before 7/23/2020. (gk) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 23, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fried, Lauren) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Miramax, LLC. correcting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #23 NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: CATEGORY CHOICE FOR FILING OF JOINT STIPULATION (Fried, Lauren) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Miramax, LLC answer now due 7/23/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fried, Lauren) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Michael D. Adams for Defendant Hot Topic Inc. in place of Attorney Phillip A. Medlin #21 . (gk) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Michael D. Adams in place of attorney Phillip A. Medlin filed by Defendant Hot Topic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Sarah Gilmartin added to party Hot Topic, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Gilmartin, Sarah) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon.com, Inc. answer now due 7/16/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Amazon.com, Inc..(Cruzen, Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant Torrid LLC, Hot Topic, Inc..(Attorney Meredith Louise Williams added to party Hot Topic, Inc.(pty:dft))(Williams, Meredith) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Firooz Zahedi, upon Defendant Torrid LLC served on 5/26/2020, answer due 7/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Kaitlyn Mannix Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Firooz Zahedi, upon Defendant Hot Topic, Inc. served on 5/26/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company c/o Kaitlyn Mannix Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Firooz Zahedi, upon Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. served on 5/26/2020, answer due 6/16/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent c/o Lyanne Gares in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Amazon.com, Inc., Hot Topic, Inc., Miramax, LLC, Torrid LLC and Urban Outfitters, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Firooz Zahedi. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Firooz Zahedi. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Firooz Zahedi. (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Firooz Zahedi, (Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26496300 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Firooz Zahedi. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Firooz Zahedi(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Torrid LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOT TOPIC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Miramax, llc. is a litigant

Latest cases where URBAN OUTFITTERS INC. is a litigant