This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2021 at 10:12:06 (UTC).

Zagorski v. The Pennant Group Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Zagorski filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against The Pennant Group Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy Joseph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01059

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy Joseph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gwen Zagorski

Defendants

The Pennant Group Inc

Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ben James Slatky

Attorney at Ademi LLP

3620 E Layton Ave

Cudahy, WI 53110

Shpetim Ademi

Attorney at Ademi LLP

3620 E Layton Ave

Cudahy, WI 53110

Defendant Attorneys

Casey M Kaiser

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

111 E Kilbourn Ave - Ste 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53202

John H Lassetter

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

80 S 8Th St - Ste 1300

Minneapolis, MN 55402-2136

Jennifer L Ciralsky

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

111 E Kilbourn Ave - Ste 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC, The Pennant Group Inc re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay MOTION to Compel . (Lassetter, John)

#15

(#15) Minute Entry for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 10/20/2021: Court discussed pending motion. (Court Reporter Zoom Audio) (rcm)

#14

(#14) DISCLOSURE Statement by Gwen Zagorski. (Slatky, Ben)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by John H Lassetter on behalf of Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC, The Pennant Group Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: John H. Lassetter (Lassetter, John)

#12

(#12) DECLARATION of Gwen Zagorski in Support of her Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Slatky, Ben)

#11

(#11) BRIEF in Opposition filed by Gwen Zagorski re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay MOTION to Compel . (Slatky, Ben)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE Statement by Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC, The Pennant Group Inc. (Ciralsky, Jennifer)

7 #1

Exhibit 1 - Mutual Agreement to Arbitrate Claims (signed by Plaintiff)

#7

(#7) DECLARATION of Raquel Pettersen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mutual Agreement to Arbitrate Claims (signed by Plaintiff))(Ciralsky, Jennifer)

#6

(#6) DECLARATION of Lee Johnson (Ciralsky, Jennifer)

#5

(#5) BRIEF in Support filed by Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC, The Pennant Group Inc re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration . (Ciralsky, Jennifer)

#4

(#11) BRIEF in Opposition filed by Gwen Zagorski re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay MOTION to Compel . (Slatky, Ben)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Casey M Kaiser on behalf of Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC, The Pennant Group Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Casey Kaiser (Kaiser, Casey)

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC, The Pennant Group Inc re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay MOTION to Compel . (Lassetter, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Minute Entry for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 10/20/2021: Court discussed pending motion. (Court Reporter Zoom Audio) (rcm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DISCLOSURE Statement by Gwen Zagorski. (Slatky, Ben)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by John H Lassetter on behalf of Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC, The Pennant Group Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: John H. Lassetter (Lassetter, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketZOOM INFORMATION for Status Conference set for 10/20/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph.#Click here to Join ZoomGov MeetingMeeting ID: 161 531 6913and Password: 313960Dial in: #+1-669-254-5252 or #+1-646-828-7666 (cc: all counsel) (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/20/2021 at 9:00 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (cc: all counsel)(asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketConsent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DECLARATION of Gwen Zagorski in Support of her Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Slatky, Ben)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEF in Opposition filed by Gwen Zagorski re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay MOTION to Compel . (Slatky, Ben)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Gwen Zagorski. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Slatky, Ben)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration filed by Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC, The Pennant Group Inc ; When filing motions which contain multiple parts the filer should select all applicable parts from the motion event list; This document does not need to be refiled; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE Statement by Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC, The Pennant Group Inc. (Ciralsky, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Raquel Pettersen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mutual Agreement to Arbitrate Claims (signed by Plaintiff))(Ciralsky, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION of Lee Johnson (Ciralsky, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BRIEF in Support filed by Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC, The Pennant Group Inc re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration . (Ciralsky, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay Proceedings and MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC, The Pennant Group Inc. (Ciralsky, Jennifer). Added MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Compel on 9/22/2021 (asc).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Casey M Kaiser on behalf of Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC, The Pennant Group Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Casey Kaiser (Kaiser, Casey)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC, The Pennant Group Inc. (Ciralsky, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Pennant Group Inc, Brenwood Park Senior Community II LLC from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2021-cv-003221 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3918060) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Milwaukee County Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ciralsky, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer L Ciralsky

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Casey M Kaiser

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John H Lassetter