This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2022 at 09:06:58 (UTC).

Zagis USA L L C v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 Zagis USA L L C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen Kay and James D Cain, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02189

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zagis U S A L L C

Defendants

Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London

Indian Harbor Insurance Co

General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona

United Specialty Insurance Co

Lexington Insurance Co

Safety Specialty Insurance Co

Old Republic Union Insurance Co

Landmark American Insurance Co

Homeland Insurance Co of New York

Q B E Specialty Insurance Co

Steadfast Insurance Co

H D I Global Specialty S E

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew E Lundy

Attorney at Lundy Lundy et al (LC)

P O Box 3010

Lake Charles, LA 70602-3010

Erik Noland

Attorney at DeJean & Noland Law Office

604 St Ferdinand St

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Kailey Kristine Gallegos

Attorney at Lundy Lundy et al (LC)

P O Box 3010

Lake Charles, LA 70602-3010

Troy Houston Middleton, IV

Attorney at Lundy Lundy et al (LC)

P O Box 3010

Lake Charles, LA 70602-3010

Defendant Attorneys

Sean Patrick Mount

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles (NO)

755 Magazine St

New Orleans, LA 70130-3672

Talbot Michael Quinn

Attorney at Adams & Reese (NO)

701 Poydras St Ste 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Matthew E Lundy on behalf of Zagis U S A L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/3/2022. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Homeland Insurance Co of New York, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Landmark American Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zagis U S A L L C identifying Corporate Parent Zagis International, Inc. for Zagis U S A L L C. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. Indian Harbor Insurance Co served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#10

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. Old Republic Union Insurance Co served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. Landmark American Insurance Co served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. Homeland Insurance Co of New York served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#17

(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. Q B E Specialty Insurance Co served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

#18

(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. United Specialty Insurance Co served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#19

(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER re #22 Motion to Adopt Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings by Landmark American Insurance Company. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay the Proceedings (Doc. 20) be GRANTED and that all claims asserted in this matter be referred to arbitration as described in the parties insurance policy. The litigation is hereby STAYED pending completion of that process, including as to Landmark American Insurance Company, and the parties are directed to notify the court within seven days of the arbitrations conclusion. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 8/26/2022. (crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Adopt Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Landmark American Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Talbot Michael Quinn added to party Landmark American Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Quinn, Talbot) Modified to simplify docket text on 8/25/2022 (Chavis, J). (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ELECTRONIC ORDER re #20 MOTION for compel arbitration and stay proceedings filed by Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, H D I Global Specialty S E, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, Steadfast Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, United Specialty Insurance Co: Responses due by 9/6/2022, Replies due by 9/12/2022. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 8/24/2022. (crt,Higgins, M) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for compel arbitration and stay proceedings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Attorney Sean Patrick Mount added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Patrick Mount added to party General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Patrick Mount added to party H D I Global Specialty S E(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Patrick Mount added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Patrick Mount added to party Lexington Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Patrick Mount added to party Old Republic Union Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Patrick Mount added to party Q B E Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Patrick Mount added to party Safety Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Patrick Mount added to party Steadfast Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Sean Patrick Mount added to party United Specialty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Mount, Sean) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. United Specialty Insurance Co served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. Q B E Specialty Insurance Co served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. Homeland Insurance Co of New York served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. Landmark American Insurance Co served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. Old Republic Union Insurance Co served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London served on 8/15/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zagis U S A L L C. Indian Harbor Insurance Co served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zagis U S A L L C identifying Corporate Parent Zagis International, Inc. for Zagis U S A L L C. (aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #2 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Erik Noland for Zagis USA, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/26/2022. (jud,Kay, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, H D I Global Specialty S E, Homeland Insurance Co of New York, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Landmark American Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, Q B E Specialty Insurance Co, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Co, United Specialty Insurance Co. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Matthew E Lundy on behalf of Zagis U S A L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/3/2022. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 12/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Chavis, J) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Erik R. Noland to Enroll as Counsel by Zagis USA, LLC. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages and Statutory Penalties against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, General Security Indemnity Co of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Homeland Insurance Co of New York, Indian Harbor Insurance Co, Landmark American Insurance Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Old Republic Union Insurance Co, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Co, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5183453) filed by Zagis USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Matthew E Lundy added to party Zagis USA, LLC(pty:pla))(aty,Lundy, Matthew) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Homeland Insurance Company of New York is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant