This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2021 at 07:10:39 (UTC).

Zaffarano v. Selective Way Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 Zaffarano filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Selective Way Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01171

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carmen Zaffarano

Defendants

Selective Way Insurance Company

SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TYLER TOMLINSON

Attorney at STARK & STARK, P.C.

777 Township Line Road, Suite 120

Yardley, PA 19067

Defendant Attorney

STEVEN J. SCHILDT

Attorney at POST & SCHELL, PC

1600 John F. Kennedy Blvd., 13Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: CAPTION CORRECTION, COUNT II AND ANSWER EXTENSION AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 4/5/21. 4/5/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STIPULATION REGARDING CAPTION CORRECTION, COUNT II AND ANSWER EXTENSION by Selective Way Insurance Company. (SCHILDT, STEVEN) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carmen Zaffarano OF COMPLAINT (TOMLINSON, TYLER) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, Selective Way Insurance Company. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 3/11/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14976290.), filed by Carmen Zaffarano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(TOMLINSON, TYLER) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selective Way Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Selective Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TYLER TOMLINSON