This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2023 at 09:05:45 (UTC).

ZACHERY v. JAVITCH BLOCK LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 ZACHERY filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against JAVITCH BLOCK LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and M. Kendra Klump. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02261

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

M. Kendra Klump

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAWN ZACHERY

Defendants

JAVITCH BLOCK LLC

PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC

PALISADES COLLECTION, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel A. Edelman

Attorney at EDELMAN COMBS LATTURNER & GOODWIN LLC

20 S. Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603-1824

Heather A. Kolbus

Attorney at EDELMAN COMBS LATTURNER GOODWIN

20 S. Clark Street, Suite 1500

Chicago, IL 60603-1824

Julia Ozello

Attorney at Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, LLC

20 S Clark St, Ste 1500

Chicago, IL 60603

Steven R. Hofer

Attorney at HOFER HAGAN LLP

8888 Keystone Crossing, Suite 1300

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Keith R. Hagan

Attorney at HOFFER HAGAN LLP

8888 Keystone Crossing, Suite 1300

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Defendant Attorneys

David M. Schultz

Attorney at HINSHAW & CULBERTSON

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Jennifer Jay Kalas

Attorney at HINSHAW & CULBERTSON

322 Indianapolis Boulevard, Suite 201

Schererville, IN 46375

Seth Row

Attorney at JAVITCH BLOCK LLC

1100 Superior Avenue, 19Th Floor

Cleveland, OH 44114-2521

Jared Douglas Brown

Attorney at SCHUCKIT & ASSOCIATES P.C.

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Sarah E. Doerr

Attorney at MOSS & BARNETT, A PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION

150 South Fifth Street, Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal , filed by Defendants PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC, PALISADES COLLECTION, L.L.C.. (Doerr, Sarah) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

#29

(#29) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff DAWN ZACHERY . (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#28

(#28) ORDER granting #26 Motion - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Dkt. 24-3 shall remain sealed. The Court accepts Dkt. 25 as the redacted version of Dkt. 24-3. Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump on 1/12/2023. (DWH) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#27

(#27) Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump. Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number (1:22-cv-02261-JRS-MKK), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (Albertson, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

26 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#26

(#26) MOTION to Maintain Exclusion/Seal of Document from Public Docket, filed by Defendant JAVITCH BLOCK LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#25

(#25) EXHIBIT re #24 Answer to Complaint EXHIBIT 3 (REDACTED) to ANSWER by JAVITCH BLOCK LLC. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

24 #1

Exhibit 1-Bill of Sale

#24

(#24) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by JAVITCH BLOCK LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Bill of Sale, #2 Exhibit 2-Assignment of Judgment, #3 Exhibit 3-Data Sheet)(Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather A. Kolbus on behalf of Plaintiff DAWN ZACHERY. (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Edelman on behalf of Plaintiff DAWN ZACHERY. (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Schultz on behalf of Defendant JAVITCH BLOCK LLC. (Schultz, David) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Jay Kalas on behalf of Defendant JAVITCH BLOCK LLC. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2-Compalint, Appearances Hagan Hofer, Summonses, Appearance Kalas, Motio

1 #1

Exhibit 1-Summons and Complaint

#1

(#30) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal , filed by Defendants PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC, PALISADES COLLECTION, L.L.C.. (Doerr, Sarah) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal , filed by Defendants PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC, PALISADES COLLECTION, L.L.C.. (Doerr, Sarah) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff DAWN ZACHERY . (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #26 Motion - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Dkt. 24-3 shall remain sealed. The Court accepts Dkt. 25 as the redacted version of Dkt. 24-3. Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump on 1/12/2023. (DWH) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump. Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number (1:22-cv-02261-JRS-MKK), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (Albertson, Steven) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Maintain Exclusion/Seal of Document from Public Docket, filed by Defendant JAVITCH BLOCK LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) EXHIBIT re #24 Answer to Complaint EXHIBIT 3 (REDACTED) to ANSWER by JAVITCH BLOCK LLC. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by JAVITCH BLOCK LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Bill of Sale, #2 Exhibit 2-Assignment of Judgment, #3 Exhibit 3-Data Sheet)(Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC, PALISADES COLLECTION, L.L.C..(Doerr, Sarah) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) AMENDED Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by PALISADES COLLECTION, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent ASTA FUNDING, INC. for PALISADES COLLECTION, L.L.C... (Doerr, Sarah) Modified on 12/20/2022 (JDC). (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ASTA FUNDING, INC. for PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC.. (Doerr, Sarah) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2023 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (SEE ORDER.) Copy sent to plaintiff via US mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 12/1/2022.(TPS) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Doerr on behalf of Defendants PALISADES ACQUISITION XVI, LLC, PALISADES COLLECTION, L.L.C.. (Doerr, Sarah) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant JAVITCH BLOCK LLC. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather A. Kolbus on behalf of Plaintiff DAWN ZACHERY. (Kolbus, Heather) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Edelman on behalf of Plaintiff DAWN ZACHERY. (Edelman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Schultz on behalf of Defendant JAVITCH BLOCK LLC. (Schultz, David) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Jay Kalas on behalf of Defendant JAVITCH BLOCK LLC. (Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior, case number 49D07-2210-PL-036414, filed by JAVITCH BLOCK LLC. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7381861) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Compalint, Appearances Hagan Hofer, Summonses, Appearance Kalas, Motion Enlargement of Time, Order Granting MET, Appearance of Brown, Notice of EOT, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kalas, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Javitch Block LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Palisades Acquisition, XVI, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PALISADES COLLECTION LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jared D Brown