This case was last updated from PACER on 03/19/2019 at 07:33:54 (UTC).

Zacarias-Cornelio v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Zacarias-Cornelio filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence L. Piersol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04009

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence L. Piersol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erik Zacarias-Cornelio

Big Spring, TX 79720

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Molly C. Quinn

Attorney at Federal Public Defender's Office

200 West 10Th Street #200

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

Respondent Attorney

Stephanie C. Bengford

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office (Sioux Falls, SD)

Po Box 2638, 357.2341, Fax: 330.4402

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2638

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to DISMISS filed by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to DISMISS by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/7/19. (Order originally filed in CR:07-40008. ) (SST) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Extend Time to File Response by United States of America. (Motion originally filed in CR:07-40008.) (SST) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Intent Not to Supplement Pro Se Motion for Reduction of Sentence re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Erik Zacarias-Cornelio. (SST) (Notice originally filed in CR:07-40008.) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie C. Bengford on behalf of United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) Refiled document in CR:07-40008-02 on 2/15/2019 (SST). (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2241 filed by Erik Zacarias-Cornelio. (KLE) Modified text on 3/13/2019 (SST). (Entered: 01/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to DISMISS filed by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to DISMISS by United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/7/19. (Order originally filed in CR:07-40008. ) (SST) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Extend Time to File Response by United States of America. (Motion originally filed in CR:07-40008.) (SST) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Intent Not to Supplement Pro Se Motion for Reduction of Sentence re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Erik Zacarias-Cornelio. (SST) (Notice originally filed in CR:07-40008.) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie C. Bengford on behalf of United States of America. (Bengford, Stephanie) Refiled document in CR:07-40008-02 on 2/15/2019 (SST). (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2241 filed by Erik Zacarias-Cornelio. (KLE) Modified text on 3/13/2019 (SST). (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.