This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2020 at 09:23:34 (UTC).

Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc. v. DMAX, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 Yusen Logistics Americas Inc filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against DMAX, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan J. Dlott and Stephanie K. Bowman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan J. Dlott

Referral Judge

Stephanie K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.

Defendants

Cargo in Containers for Way Bill #STR0035042, # STR0034989, and # STR0034980

DMAX, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc S Blubaugh

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff - 2

41 South High Street, 26Th Floor

Columbus, OH 43215

Steven Andrew Oldham

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff LLP

41 South High Street, Suite 2600

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant DMAX, Ltd. c/o Corporation Service Company. Filed by Plaintiff Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.. (Blubaugh, Marc) Modified docket text on 3/18/2020 (eh). (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant DMAX, Ltd.. DMAX, Ltd. served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. Filed by Plaintiff Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.. (Blubaugh, Marc) Modified docket on 3/18/2020 (eh). (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#14

(#14) Summons Issued as to DMAX, Ltd statutory agent.. (jlw) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#13

(#13) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Blubaugh, Marc) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#12

(#12) IN REM WARRANT FOR ARREST OF CARGO issued. (km) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WARRANT FOR CARGO ARREST granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Order for the Issuance of Warrant for Arrest of Cargo. The Clerk of Court shall immediate prepare a warrant for the arrest of cargo and deliver it to the United States Marshal for the Southern District of Ohio. Any person claiming an interest in the Cargo shall be entitled to a prompt hearing on request at which time Plaintiff shall be required to show cause why the arrest should not be vacated, or whether other relief consistent with the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims should be granted. A copy of this order shall be attached to and served with the Warrant for Arrest in this action. Plaintiff shall be responsible for the payment of all storage or other related fees, to be paid in a timely manner, required for the Cargo to remain at its current location until otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/11/2020. (km) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#10

(#10) Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #3 MOTION for Order to [Motion for Arrest of Cargo] [PLAINTIFF YUSEN (AMERICAS) INC.S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ARREST OF CARGO] filed by Plaintiff Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.. (Blubaugh, Marc) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Arrest of Cargo. IT IS ORDERED: (1) Plaintiff shall file a memorandum, not to exceed 10 pages, to further explain why admiralty jurisdiction exists on or before 3/17/2020. In lieu of said memorandum, Plaintiff may withdraw the pending motion seeking the arrest of cargo; (2) Following the filing of Plaintiff's memorandum, the Court will promptly address the underlying Rule C motion for the arrest of cargo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/3/2020. (km) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

8 #1

Summons Form

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Cargo in Containers for Way Bill #STR0035042, # STR0034989, and # STR0034980, DMAX, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (jlw) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc., Yusen Logistics Co., Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Yusen Logistics Co., Ltd. for Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc... (Blubaugh, Marc) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#6

(#6) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [CARGO IN CONTAINERS FOR WAY BILL # STR0035042, # STR0034989, and # STR0034980] (Blubaugh, Marc) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [DMAX, Ltd.] (Blubaugh, Marc) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/25/2020. (jlw) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order [In Rem Warrant for Arrest of Cargo]

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order [Order for Issuance of Warrant for Cargo Arrest]

#3

(#3) MOTION for Order to [Motion for Arrest of Cargo] by Plaintiff Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Order for Issuance of Warrant for Cargo Arrest], #2 Text of Proposed Order [In Rem Warrant for Arrest of Cargo]) (Blubaugh, Marc) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 2/24/2020. (jlw) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: DMAX, Ltd. answer due 4/1/2020. (eh) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant DMAX, Ltd. c/o Corporation Service Company. Filed by Plaintiff Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.. (Blubaugh, Marc) Modified docket text on 3/18/2020 (eh). (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant DMAX, Ltd.. DMAX, Ltd. served on 3/11/2020, answer due 4/1/2020. Filed by Plaintiff Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.. (Blubaugh, Marc) Modified docket on 3/18/2020 (eh). (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Summons Issued as to DMAX, Ltd statutory agent.. (jlw) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Blubaugh, Marc) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) IN REM WARRANT FOR ARREST OF CARGO issued. (km) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WARRANT FOR CARGO ARREST granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Order for the Issuance of Warrant for Arrest of Cargo. The Clerk of Court shall immediate prepare a warrant for the arrest of cargo and deliver it to the United States Marshal for the Southern District of Ohio. Any person claiming an interest in the Cargo shall be entitled to a prompt hearing on request at which time Plaintiff shall be required to show cause why the arrest should not be vacated, or whether other relief consistent with the Supplemental Rules for Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims should be granted. A copy of this order shall be attached to and served with the Warrant for Arrest in this action. Plaintiff shall be responsible for the payment of all storage or other related fees, to be paid in a timely manner, required for the Cargo to remain at its current location until otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/11/2020. (km) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #3 MOTION for Order to [Motion for Arrest of Cargo] [PLAINTIFF YUSEN (AMERICAS) INC.S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ARREST OF CARGO] filed by Plaintiff Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.. (Blubaugh, Marc) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Arrest of Cargo. IT IS ORDERED: (1) Plaintiff shall file a memorandum, not to exceed 10 pages, to further explain why admiralty jurisdiction exists on or before 3/17/2020. In lieu of said memorandum, Plaintiff may withdraw the pending motion seeking the arrest of cargo; (2) Following the filing of Plaintiff's memorandum, the Court will promptly address the underlying Rule C motion for the arrest of cargo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/3/2020. (km) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Cargo in Containers for Way Bill #STR0035042, # STR0034989, and # STR0034980, DMAX, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (jlw) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc., Yusen Logistics Co., Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Yusen Logistics Co., Ltd. for Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc... (Blubaugh, Marc) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [CARGO IN CONTAINERS FOR WAY BILL # STR0035042, # STR0034989, and # STR0034980] (Blubaugh, Marc) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [DMAX, Ltd.] (Blubaugh, Marc) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 2/25/2020. (jlw) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Order to [Motion for Arrest of Cargo] by Plaintiff Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Order for Issuance of Warrant for Cargo Arrest], #2 Text of Proposed Order [In Rem Warrant for Arrest of Cargo]) (Blubaugh, Marc) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 2/24/2020. (jlw) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Cargo in Containers for Way Bill #STR0035042, # STR0034989, and # STR0034980, DMAX, Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7347284), filed by Yusen Logistics (Americas) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Blubaugh, Marc) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YUSEN LOGISTICS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Andrew Oldham(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marc S Blubaugh