This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2019 at 07:50:47 (UTC).

Yupoong Inc. et al v. 723 Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 Yupoong Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against 723 Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John J. Tharp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06675

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLEXFIT LLC

YUPOONG INC.

80 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Allen Kurtz

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig, PLLC

55 E. Monroe St., Suite 3800

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#40

#39

#38

#37

#36

#34

#33

#35

28 #1

Declaration Nicholas A. Kurtz

8 #9

Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 48-61

8 #8

Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 41-47

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #38 , defendants Shanghai Zhengxing Clothing Co., Ltd. and Cangzhou Alegria Import & Export Trading Co., Ltd. are dismissed from this case. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #36 , the 20 defendants listed in the notice are dismissed from this case. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #33 , the 17 defendants listed in the notice are dismissed from this case.Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs OF CERTAIN DEFENDANTS (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 11/13/2019. Mailed notice(air, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Motion hearing held. Defendant did not appear. For reasons stated on the record, plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #28 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) #30 , defendants Dongguan Telunsi Sports Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Golden Quartet Industry And Trade Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Tohom Gift Co., Ltd., Shijiazhuang E-Feeling Import And Export Trading Co., Ltd., Shijiazhuang Yuanqi Trading Co., Ltd., Yantai Hanyi Clothing Co., Ltd., get_treasure are dismissed from this case. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs FLEXFIT LLC, YUPOONG INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 1-17, #2 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 18-28, #3 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 29-40, #4 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 41-47, #5 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 48-61, #6 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 62-74, #7 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 75-86, #8 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 87-99, #9 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 100-114, #10 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 115-128, #11 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 129-147, #12 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 148-171, #13 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 172-191, #14 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 192-210, #15 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 211-231, #16 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 232-251, #17 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 252-291, #18 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 292-347, #19 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 348-399, #20 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 400-415, #21 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 416-432, #22 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 433-446, #23 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 447-462, #24 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 463-477, #25 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 478-491, #26 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 492-506, #27 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 507-524, #28 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 525-537, #29 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 538-553, #30 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 554-584, #31 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 585-604, #32 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 605-625, #33 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 626-642, #34 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 643-661, #35 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 662-690, #36 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 691-705, #37 Exhibit Arnaiz Ex. 1 - DOES 706-723)(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION by Plaintiffs FLEXFIT LLC, YUPOONG INC. for temporary restraining order (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration Hayley Oh, #3 Declaration Nicholas Kurtz, #4 Declaration Jessica Arnaiz, #5 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 1-17, #6 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 18-28, #7 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 29-40, #8 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 41-47, #9 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 48-61, #10 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 62-74, #11 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 75-86, #12 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 87-99, #13 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 100-114, #14 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 115-128, #15 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 129-147, #16 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 148-171, #17 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 172-191, #18 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 192-210, #19 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 211-231, #20 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 232-251, #21 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 252-291, #22 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 292-347, #23 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 348-399, #24 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 400-415, #25 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 416-432, #26 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 433-446, #27 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 447-462, #28 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 463-477, #29 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 478-491, #30 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 492-506, #31 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 507-524, #32 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 525-537, #33 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 538-553, #34 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 554-584, #35 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 585-604, #36 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 605-625, #37 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 626-642, #38 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 643-661, #39 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 662-690, #40 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 691-705, #41 Exhibit Arnaiz Decl. Ex 1 - DOES 706-723)(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Plaintiffs FLEXFIT LLC, YUPOONG INC. for leave to file excess pages (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF CLAIMS INVOLVING TRADEMARKS by FLEXFIT LLC, YUPOONG INC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs FLEXFIT LLC, YUPOONG INC. by Nicholas Allen Kurtz (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs FLEXFIT LLC, YUPOONG INC. Schedule A to Complaint (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by YUPOONG INC., FLEXFIT LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16319943.(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Allen Kurtz