This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/27/2022 at 12:56:22 (UTC).

Yuen et al v. IDEXX Laboratories, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On July 25, 2022, Cam Yuen, Arrianna Garcia, Kathryn Heberling, Susan McVinney, Sunny Stimson, Ellen Berman, Neil Murphy, Dennis Wild, Andrea Bury, Miranda Smelcer and Others (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, represented by Joshua P. Davis of Berger Montague PC, filed a class action lawsuit against IDEXX Laboratories, Inc. and IDEXX Distribution, Inc. (collectively, “IDEXX'' or “Defendants”), seeking declaratory judgment, injunctive relief and damages, for alleged anticompetitive practices and antitrust violations. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California, with Judge Vince Chhabria presiding. 

In the complaint, Plaintiffs alleged, “IDEXX’s anticompetitive behavior has caused pet owners like Plaintiffs and other similarly situated indirect purchasers to pay artificially inflated prices for in-house point-of-care (‘POC’) analyzers, consumables, and single-use rapid test kits, which are components of in-house POC diagnostic tests that veterinary practices use to treat family pets and other companion animal patients.”

The plaintiffs stated. “Plaintiffs and those similarly situated rely on in-house point-of-care (‘POC’) diagnostic laboratory tests provided by their veterinary practices to treat family pets and other companion animal patients when fast test results are needed. Such tests are critical in providing timely care by allowing veterinary practices to test, diagnose, and treat certain conditions, such as heart worm, during a single office visit, and they are often used when patients require surgery or other emergency intervention. IDEXX is a multinational corporation that develops, manufactures, and distributes a range of products across various veterinary, livestock, and water testing markets.”

The plaintiffs further alleged, “Instead of then competing on the merits in the market for POC Diagnostic Products as contemplated by the FTC Order though, IDEXX upended its entire distribution network—cutting loose the distributors it previously had relied on—in order to maintain exclusive restraints in the Relevant Market and Submarkets without violating the letter of the FTC’s Order.”

Plaintiffs also alleged, “After cutting out the distributors, IDEXX proceeded to lock the vast majority of veterinary practices into long-term exclusive agreements, thereby substantially foreclosing competition, and maintaining and enhancing its monopoly power over POC Diagnostic Products. As a result of this anticompetitive scheme, IDEXX has been able to impose supracompetitive prices for POC Diagnostic Products on Plaintiffs and members of the Class.”

The plaintiffs additionally alleged, “IDEXX also designs its products to ensure that veterinary practices will not use more than one brand of analyzer at a time. It is impractical for a practice to train staff on the simultaneous use and upkeep of different brands of analyzers.”

The plaintiffs further alleged, “Because IDEXX has prevented actual or potential rivals from gaining a foothold in the Relevant Market and Submarkets, it has eliminated or impaired the price discipline that would come from free and fair competition.”

Plaintiffs presented forty three claims for relief including violation of Section 1 of the Sherman Act, abuse of monopoly power, violation of Arizona Antitrust Act, California’s Cartwright Act, and similarly antitrust laws of other states.

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiffs requested a judgment seeking declaratory relief that IDEXX misused its dominant position, injunctive relief against further violations together with an award of actual, double, treble, and exemplary damages and costs of litigation. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-04297

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cam Yuen

Arrianna Garcia

Kathryn Heberling

Susan McVinney

Sunny Stimson

Ellen Berman

Neil Murphy

Dennis Wild

Andrea Bury

Miranda Smelcer

Marcia Potts

Sheryl Emerson

Chrysta Cataldo

Marlena Giga

Gina Giorgio

Michelle Carpenter

Valerie Hitz

Shavonna Armstrong

Hilary Allred

Melissa Marshall

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua P. Davis

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

59A Montford Avenue

Mill Valley, CA 94941

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Davis, Joshua) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#4

(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hilary Allred, Shavonna Armstrong, Ellen Berman, Andrea Bury, Michelle Carpenter, Chrysta Cataldo, Joseph Duncan, Sheryl Emerson, Arrianna Garcia, Marlena Giga, Gina Giorgio, Kathryn Heberling, Valerie Hitz, Melissa Marshall, Susan McVinney, Neil Murphy, Marcia Potts, Dawn Reynosa, Miranda Smelcer, Sunny Stimson, Dennis Wild, Cam Yuen.. (Davis, Joshua) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hilary Allred, Shavonna Armstrong, Ellen Berman, Andrea Bury, Michelle Carpenter, Chrysta Cataldo, Joseph Duncan, Sheryl Emerson, Arrianna Garcia, Marlena Giga, Gina Giorgio, Kathryn Heberling, Valerie Hitz, Melissa Marshall, Susan McVinney, Neil Murphy, Marcia Potts, Dawn Reynosa, Miranda Smelcer, Sunny Stimson, Dennis Wild, Cam Yuen (Davis, Joshua) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hilary Allred, Shavonna Armstrong, Ellen Berman, Andrea Bury, Michelle Carpenter, Chrysta Cataldo, Joseph Duncan, Sheryl Emerson, Arrianna Garcia, Marlena Giga, Gina Giorgio, Kathryn Heberling, Valerie Hitz, Melissa Marshall, Susan McVinney, Neil Murphy, Marcia Potts, Dawn Reynosa, Miranda Smelcer, Sunny Stimson, Dennis Wild, Cam Yuen (Davis, Joshua) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hilary Allred, Shavonna Armstrong, Ellen Berman, Andrea Bury, Michelle Carpenter, Chrysta Cataldo, Joseph Duncan, Sheryl Emerson, Arrianna Garcia, Marlena Giga, Gina Giorgio, Kathryn Heberling, Valerie Hitz, Melissa Marshall, Susan McVinney, Neil Murphy, Marcia Potts, Dawn Reynosa, Miranda Smelcer, Sunny Stimson, Dennis Wild, Cam Yuen.. (Davis, Joshua) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/9/2022. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Davis, Joshua) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against IDEXX Distribution, Inc., IDEXX Laboratories, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17381652.). Filed byMarcia Potts, Joseph Duncan, Neil Murphy, Valerie Hitz, Arrianna Garcia, Dawn Reynosa, Cam Yuen, Shavonna Armstrong, Michelle Carpenter, Chrysta Cataldo, Ellen Berman, Kathryn Heberling, Andrea Bury, Sheryl Emerson, Marlena Giga, Gina Giorgio, Melissa Marshall, Dennis Wild, Susan McVinney, Hilary Allred, Miranda Smelcer, Sunny Stimson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Joshua) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua P. Davis