This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/22/2022 at 09:12:15 (UTC).

Yucaipa American Alliance Fund I, L.P. et al v. Youngman

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 Yucaipa American Alliance Fund I, L P filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Youngman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01650

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Yucaipa American Alliance Fund I, L.P.

Yucaipa American Alliance (Parallel) Fund I, L.P.

Debtor

ASHINC Corporation, et al.

Respondent

Catherine E. Youngman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Laura Davis Jones

Attorney at Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl & Jones, LLP

919 North Market Street, Suite 1600, P.O. Box 8705

Wilmington, DE 19899-8705

Peter James Keane

Attorney at Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl & Jones, LLP

919 North Market Street, Suite 1600, P.O. Box 8705

Wilmington, DE 19899-8705

Respondent Attorney

Seth Andrew Niederman

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

919 North Market Street, Suite 300, P.O. Box 2323

Wilmington, DE 19899-2323

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Withdrawal record from case number 13-50530 (CSS) (apk) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/24/2021) (mal). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#4

(#3) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion of Yucaipa American Alliance Fund I, L.P. and Yucaipa American Alliance (Parallel) Fund I, L.P. for Entry of an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and Bankruptcy Rule 5011(a) Withdrawing the Reference of Adversary Proceedings - filed by Yucaipa American Alliance (Parallel) Fund I, L.P., Yucaipa American Alliance Fund I, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jones, Laura) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

4 #1

Exhibit A

4 #2

Exhibit B

#4

(#4) OBJECTIONS by Catherine E. Youngman to #3 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion of Yucaipa American Alliance Fund I, L.P. and Yucaipa American Alliance (Parallel) Fund I, L.P. for Entry of an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and Bankruptcy Rule 5011(a) W . (Niederman, Seth) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by Seth Andrew Niederman (Niederman, Seth) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by Seth Andrew Niederman (Niederman, Seth) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) OBJECTIONS by Catherine E. Youngman to #3 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion of Yucaipa American Alliance Fund I, L.P. and Yucaipa American Alliance (Parallel) Fund I, L.P. for Entry of an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and Bankruptcy Rule 5011(a) W . (Niederman, Seth) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion of Yucaipa American Alliance Fund I, L.P. and Yucaipa American Alliance (Parallel) Fund I, L.P. for Entry of an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 157(d) and Bankruptcy Rule 5011(a) Withdrawing the Reference of Adversary Proceedings - filed by Yucaipa American Alliance (Parallel) Fund I, L.P., Yucaipa American Alliance Fund I, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jones, Laura) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketRemark: Case Submitted for Routine Judicial Assignment. (apk) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Withdrawal record from case number 13-50530 (CSS) (apk) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/24/2021) (mal). (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Withdraw Reference - filed by Yucaipa American Alliance (Parallel) Fund I, L.P., Yucaipa American Alliance Fund I, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal, #2 Notice of Completion)(apk) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketAdversary Cause of Action: Withdrawing the Reference of Adversary Proceedings (apk) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yucaipa American Alliance (Parallel) Fund I, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth Andrew Niederman