This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2020 at 07:58:32 (UTC).

Youngsuk Kim v. Benihana, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 Youngsuk Kim filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Benihana, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenly Kiya Kato, Christina A. Snyder and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02196

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

Presiding Judges

Christina A. Snyder

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Youngsuk Kim

Defendants

Benihana, Inc.

Does 1-100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephanie Emi Yasuda

Attorney at Yoon Law APC

One Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Kenneth H Yoon

Attorney at Yoon Law APC

One Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3383

Brian G Lee

Attorney at Yoon Law APC

One Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jong Yun Kim

Attorney at Law Offices of Jong Yun Kim

3600 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2226

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Preston H Lim

Attorney at Lim Law Group PC

3435 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2350

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel J Herling

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo PC

44 Montgomery Street 36Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Nicole Ozeran

Attorney at Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo PC

2029 Century Park East Suite 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#19

#17

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

8 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaint

8 #1

Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Benihana, Inc.

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#2

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action #8 is granted. Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action is dismissed without prejudice. (iv) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action #8 , currently set for hearing on January 9, 2020, is taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on that date. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (cw) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action #8 is continued to 1/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • (#15) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Amended NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Benihana, Inc., identifying Angelo Gordon and Co.. (Ozeran, Nicole) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:19-cv-2196 FMO (KKx). (esa) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action Benihana, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action #8 filed by Plaintiff Youngsuk Kim. (Yasuda, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action Benihana, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action #8 Amended to Include Judge's Initials on Caption filed by Defendant Benihana, Inc.. (Herling, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Benihana, Inc., Proof of Service of Notice to Adverse Parties and the Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court served on November 14, 2019. (Herling, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nicole Ozeran on behalf of Defendant Benihana, Inc. (Ozeran, Nicole) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action Benihana, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action filed by defendant Benihana, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 12/23/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Benihana, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action) (Herling, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel J Herling on behalf of Defendant Benihana, Inc. (Herling, Daniel) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:19-cv-02196 CAS (KKx). (ghap) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Kenly Kiya Kato. New Case Number 5:19-cv-2196-JGB (KKx). (ghap) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVDS1928928 with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 11/13/2019, receipt number 0973-24778983), filed by defendant Benihana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herling, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Benihana, Inc. NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendantg Benihana, Inc., (Herling, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVDS1928928 Receipt No: 0973-24778983 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Benihana, Inc.. (Attorney Daniel J Herling added to party Benihana, Inc.(pty:dft))(Herling, Daniel) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BENIHANA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jong Yun Kim

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian G. Lee