This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:26:23 (UTC).

Youngstown Area Electrical Welfare Fund v. McCool

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Youngstown Area Electrical Welfare Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against McCool. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Benita Y. Pearson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-02835

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benita Y. Pearson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Youngstown Area Electrical Welfare Fund

Defendants

Julie McCool

Julie Dubiel

Julie Dubiel McCool

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph D. Kondela

Attorney at Faulkner, Hoffman & Phillips

100 Federal Plaza, East, P.O. Box 849

Youngstown, OH 44503

Stanley J. Okusewsky, III

Attorney at Green Haines Sgambati - Youngstown

100 Federal Plaza, East, P.O. Box 849

Youngstown, OH 44503

Dennis Haines

Attorney at Green Haines Sgambati - Youngstown

100 Federal Plaza, East, P.O. Box 849

Youngstown, OH 44503

Jeffrey J. Geisinger

Attorney at Green Haines Sgambati - Youngstown

100 Federal Plaza, East, P.O. Box 849

Youngstown, OH 44503

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Joseph D. Kondela and adding attorney Jeffrey J. Geisinger filed by on behalf of Youngstown Area Electrical Welfare Fund. (Geisinger, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Julie McCool placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: ordinary mail. (S,Ke) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request to Clerk for service upon Julie McCool by ordinary mail. filed by Youngstown Area Electrical Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Mailing)(Kondela, Joseph) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service by Clerk Unexecuted upon Julie McCool. Service attempted by Certified Mail (Notice Left, No Authorized Recipient Available) on 12/13/2019 (obtained from USPS website). Return to Sender - Unclaimed - Unable to Forward - Return to Sender. Filed on behalf of Youngstown Area Electrical Welfare Fund. Related document #3 (W,K) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Julie McCool placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7019 1120 0002 0517 5470. (M,R) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Julie McCool. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,Ke) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (S,Ke) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (S,Ke) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Youngstown Area Electrical Welfare Fund. (Kondela, Joseph) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Julie McCool. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9664585.. Filed by Youngstown Area Electrical Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Kondela, Joseph) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.