This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 07:28:40 (UTC).

YOUNG v. WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 YOUNG filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David S. Cercone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00104

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David S. Cercone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREW YOUNG

Defendant

WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John E. Black

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah J. Miley

Morgan Dull

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6906024), filed by ANDREW YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kss) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC (kss) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANDREW YOUNG. WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC waiver sent on 1/19/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Black, John) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Additional Defenses by WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC. (Miley, Sarah) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC. (Miley, Sarah) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Dull on behalf of WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC. (Dull, Morgan) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Dull on behalf of WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC. (Dull, Morgan) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC. (Miley, Sarah) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Additional Defenses by WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC. (Miley, Sarah) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANDREW YOUNG. WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC waiver sent on 1/19/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (Black, John) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC (kss) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6906024), filed by ANDREW YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kss) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less