This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2022 at 08:22:04 (UTC).

Young v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 Young filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00413

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tessie Young

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacqueline Alexandra Stump

Attorney at PMR Law

3701 Kirby, Ste 530

Houston, TX 77098

Tej R Paranjpe

Attorney at Paranjpe & Mahadass LLP

3701 Kirby, Suite 530

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorneys

John A. Ramirez

Attorney at Bush Ramirez, LLC

5615 Kirby Dr, Ste 900

Houston, TX 77005

Amy Elizabeth Parette

Attorney at Bush & Ramirez, PLLC

5615 Kirby Dr., Ste. 900

Houston, TX 77005

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER. An initial conference is scheduled for 03/30/2022 in this matter. The parties havent filed a joint discovery and case management plan in accord with section 9(b) of this Court's procedures. The parties must file such plan by 03/23/2022.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Ramirez, John) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#12

(#12) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Tessie Young, filed.(Paranjpe, Tej) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Tessie Young, filed.(Paranjpe, Tej) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Parette on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Parette, Amy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#9

(#9) STATEMENT of Information in Removed Action re: #3 Order in Removed Case - FORM by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Parette, Amy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

8 #3

Exhibit

8 #2

Exhibit

8 #1

Exhibit

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

5 #2

Exhibit

5 #1

Exhibit

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 06/01/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 04/29/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 11/29/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 01/04/2023. Discovery due by 02/22/2023. Mediation due by 05/09/2023. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 03/24/2023. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 03/24/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 06/08/2023. Docket Call set for 07/18/2023 at 1:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jennellegonzalez) (Entered: 3/1/2022) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#3

(#3) Order in Removed Case. Statement due within ten days.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/30/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER: Minute entry for proceedings before Judge Charles Eskridge on March 30, 2022. INITIAL CONFERENCE. All parties represented by counsel.The Court addressed the parties' joint discovery and case management plan. Dkt 15. The Court addressed the scheduling and docket control order. Dkt 4. The deadline for Defendant to designate its expert witnesses was REVISED to January 27, 2023. All other deadlines remain. The parties should continue to confer in good faith regarding discovery. Appearances: Jacqueline Alexandra Stump f/ Plaintiff; Amy Elizabeth Parette f/ Defendant. Ct Reporter: ERO. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • Docket(#15) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Parette, Amy) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER. An initial conference is scheduled for 03/30/2022 in this matter. The parties havent filed a joint discovery and case management plan in accord with section 9(b) of this Court's procedures. The parties must file such plan by 03/23/2022.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Ramirez, John) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Tessie Young, filed.(Paranjpe, Tej) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Tessie Young, filed.(Paranjpe, Tej) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Parette on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Parette, Amy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATEMENT of Information in Removed Action re: #3 Order in Removed Case - FORM by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Parette, Amy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Parette, Amy) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 06/01/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 04/29/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 11/29/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 01/04/2023. Discovery due by 02/22/2023. Mediation due by 05/09/2023. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 03/24/2023. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 03/24/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 06/08/2023. Docket Call set for 07/18/2023 at 1:30 PM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jennellegonzalez) (Entered: 3/1/2022) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order in Removed Case. Statement due within ten days.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/30/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 189th District Court, Harris County, case number 2022-01562 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27719333) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Original Answer - State Court, #4 Exhibit Jury Demand - State Court)(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John A Ramirez