This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2022 at 08:41:44 (UTC).

Young v. U.S. Money Reserve, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Young filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against U S Money Reserve, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Valerie E. Caproni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02098

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie E. Caproni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lawrence Young

Defendant

U.S. Money Reserve, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb

Michael A. LaBollita

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. Money Reserve, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25858841)Document filed by Lawrence Young..(LaBollita, Michael) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Money Reserve, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(LaBollita, Michael) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Money Reserve, Inc...(gp) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT: Initial Conference set for 7/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/17/2022) (tg) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. U.S. Money Reserve, Inc. served on 3/30/2022, answer due 4/20/2022. Service was accepted by Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(LaBollita, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. U.S. Money Reserve, Inc. served on 3/30/2022, answer due 4/20/2022. Service was accepted by Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(LaBollita, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT: Initial Conference set for 7/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/17/2022) (tg) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Money Reserve, Inc...(gp) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Lawrence Young..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Money Reserve, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lawrence Young..(LaBollita, Michael) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. Money Reserve, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25858841)Document filed by Lawrence Young..(LaBollita, Michael) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less