This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2021 at 09:14:07 (UTC).

Young v. UOP LLC

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 Young filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against UOP LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00282

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darius Young

Defendant

UOP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul F. Bell

Attorney at Bell Law Firm, LLC

4949 Tulane Drive

Baton Rouge, LA 70808-4764

Defendant Attorney

Hal D. Ungar

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

701 Poydras Street, Suite 3500

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons

#2

#3

#5

5 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by UOP LLC, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a). UOP LLC's responsive pleadings are due by August 6, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 07/15/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by UOP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ungar, Hal) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Counsel: In light of the defendant having not made an appearance in this matter, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 9/2/2021 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. A Status Report due by 8/19/202(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/19/2021. (BLR) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to UOP LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against UOP LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2287573.), filed by Darius Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Bell, Paul) Modified on 5/17/2021 to edit docket text (SWE). (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UOP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hal D Ungar