This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2022 at 09:25:27 (UTC).

YOUNG v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 YOUNG filed an Other lawsuit against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02623

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DR. S. STANLEY YOUNG

S. STANLEY YOUNG

LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR.

Defendants

UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY

MICHAEL S. REGAN

SCIENCE ADVISORY BOARD

ALISON C. CULLEN

CLEAN AIR SCIENTIFIC ADVISORY COMMITTEE

ELIZABETH A. SHEPPARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Patrick Falvey

Attorney at JONES DAY

51 Louisiana Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Brett A. Shumate

Attorney at JONES DAY

51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Stephen J. Kenny

Attorney at JONES DAY

51 Louisiana Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Defendant Attorney

John Robinson

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

1100 L Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#35

RESTRICTED

34 #2

Exhibit B

34 #1

Exhibit A

34 #34

Main Document

33 #1

Exhibit A

33 #33

Main Document

8 #23

Exhibit Q to Shumate Decl.

8 #16

Exhibit J to Shumate Decl.

8 #7

Exhibit A to Shumate Decl.

1 #14

Summons (Sheppard)

1 #12

Summons (Cullen)

1 #11

Summons (SAB)

1 #9

Summons (EPA)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Main Document

93 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) TRANSCRIPT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING before Judge Timothy J. Kelly held on 12-22-21; Page Numbers: 1-68; Date of Issuance: 5-5-22; Court Reporter: Timothy R. Miller, Telephone Number (202) 354-3111. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter refer enced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/26/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2022.(Miller, Timothy) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Final CASAC Reports by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shumate, Brett) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of CASAC Meeting and Vote by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shumate, Brett) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of #31 Order denying Plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/16/2022. (lctjk3) (Main Document 32 replaced to correct typo on 2/18/2022) (zkh). (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/16/2022. (lctjk3) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE of Draft CASAC Meeting Agenda and Draft Reports by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Ex. A, #2 Ex. B, #3 Ex. C)(Shumate, Brett) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Scheduled Meetings of the Clean Air Scientific Advisory Committee by CLEAN AIR SCIENTIFIC ADVISORY COMMITTEE, ALISON C. CULLEN, MICHAEL S. REGAN, SCIENCE ADVISORY BOARD, ELIZABETH A. SHEPPARD, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Federal Register Notice)(Robinson, John) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Timothy J. Kelly: VTC Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 12/22/2021. Oral argument heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Timothy Miller) (zkh) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) JOINT APPENDIX by LOUIS ANTHONY COX, JR, S. STANLEY YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Shumate, Brett) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #26 Joint Motion for Privacy Act Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/6/2021. (lctjk3) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Motion due by 10/22/2021. Response, Cross Motion and Administrative Record due by 11/5/2021. Reply and Response to Cross Motion due by 11/15/2021. Reply to Cross Motion due by 11/24/2021. (zkh) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' #6 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a motion for preliminary injunction or, in the alternative, a motion for expedited partial summary judgment on Counts V through VIII by October 22, 2021; Defendants shall file their combined opposition to Plaintiff's motion and cross-motion for partial summary judgment as well as supply the administrative record to Plaintiff by November 5, 2021; Plaintiff shall submit its combined reply to Defendants' opposition and opposition to Defendants' cross-motion for partial summary judgment by November 15, 2021; Defendants shall submit their reply in support of their cross-motion for partial summary judgment by November 24, 2021. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' obligation to answer Plaintiff's complaint is stayed until 30 days after the resolution of the motion for preliminary injunction and/or cross-motions for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/19/2021. (lctjk3) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Kenny on behalf of S. STANLEY YOUNG (Kenny, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by CLEAN AIR SCIENTIFIC ADVISORY COMMITTEE, ALISON C. CULLEN, MICHAEL S. REGAN, SCIENCE ADVISORY BOARD, ELIZABETH A. SHEPPARD, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, John) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John Robinson on behalf of All Defendants (Robinson, John) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER: See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/08/2021. (lctjk3) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (znmg) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Patrick Falvey on behalf of S. STANLEY YOUNG (Falvey, Joseph) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8786313) filed by S. STANLEY YOUNG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons (EPA), #10 Summons (Regan), #11 Summons (SAB), #12 Summons (Cullen), #13 Summons (CASAC), #14 Summons (Sheppard))(Shumate, Brett) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Robinson, Jr.