This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2021 at 09:12:44 (UTC).

Young v. Pilot Travel Centers, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 Young filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Pilot Travel Centers, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00006

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dekevian Young

Defendants

PFJ Southeast, LLC

Thomas Protective Services, Inc.

Pilot Travel Centers, LLC

John Does 1-15

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shofaetiyah D. Watson

Attorney at The Watson Law Firm, LLC

P.O. Box 6002

Atlanta, GA 31107

Defendant Attorneys

Michael T. Hammond

Attorney at Morgan & Akins, PLLC

4779 S. Atlanta Road Se, Suite 350

Atlanta, GA 30339

Nicholas Akins

Attorney at Morgan & Akins

Suite 350, 4779 S. Atlanta Rd., S.E.

Atlanta, GA 30339

Frederick Owen Ferrand

Attorney at Swift Currie McGhee & Hiers

1355 Peachtree Street, N.E., The Peachtree, Suite 300

Atlanta, GA 30309-3238

Lauren E. H. Meadows

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

 

Court Documents

#13

12 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kristin Seabrook

#12

11 #1

list of potential witnesses

#11

#10

9 #1

Exhibit E - Thomas Dec Page Redacted

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #7

Exhibit -F -TPS SOS Registration

1 #6

Exhibit -E -PFJ SOS Registration

1 #5

Exhibit -D -Pilot SOS Registration

1 #4

Exhibit -C -Co-Defendent's Consent

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Thomas Protective Service's First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production by Thomas Protective Services, Inc..(Meadows, Lauren) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Submission to Judge Terminated re #12 Supplemental Notice of Removal. (bgt) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #6 Order, to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jta) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by Thomas Protective Services, Inc. re #6 Order, Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Kristin Seabrook)(Meadows, Lauren) Modified on 2/18/2021 to edit text (jta). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First Initial Disclosures by Dekevian Young. (Attachments: #1 list of potential witnesses)(Watson, Shofaetiyah) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER APPROVING re: #8 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified: This case is assigned to an eight-month discovery track. Discovery shall be completed on or before October 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 2/3/2021. (jta) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial Disclosures by Thomas Protective Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Thomas Dec Page Redacted)(Meadows, Lauren) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Thomas Protective Services, Inc.. (Meadows, Lauren) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: The Court thus ORDERS Defendant TPS to SHOW CAUSE, on or before February 19, 2021, why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. To the extent Defendant TPS believes diversity jurisdiction is proper, the Court ORDERS Defendant TPS to supplement its notice of removal to properly state all parties citizenship and shows compliance with the requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1332. Failure to do so will result in the Court remanding this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to resubmit this matter after the expiration of the deadline. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/22/2021. (jta) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 7/24/2020. (bgt) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/20. (eop) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by PFJ Southeast, LLC and Pilot Travel Centers, LLC. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Thomas Protective Services, Inc.. Discovery ends on 6/3/2021.(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Thomas Protective Services, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-10559872) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Filing, #2 Exhibit -A -State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit -B -Notice of Filing of Removal, #4 Exhibit -C -Co-Defendent's Consent, #5 Exhibit -D -Pilot SOS Registration, #6 Exhibit -E -PFJ SOS Registration, #7 Exhibit -F -TPS SOS Registration, #8 Exhibit -State Court Answer -Thomas, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THOMAS PROTECTIVE SERVICE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PFJ Southeast LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PILOT TRAVEL CENTERS LLC is a litigant