This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2020 at 10:37:24 (UTC).

Young v. Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Young filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason William Young

Defendants

Does 1-10

Sam McCoy

Ronald Spears

Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority

Okmulgee Board of County Commissioners

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald E. Smolen, II

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

John W. Warren

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Defendant Attorneys

Robert S. Lafferrandre

Attorney at Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green, LLP (OKC)

Po Box 26350

Oklahoma City, OK 73126

Randall J. Wood

Attorney at Pierce Couch Hendrickson Baysinger & Green, LLP (OKC)

Po Box 26350

Oklahoma City, OK 73126

Ambre C. Gooch

Attorney at Collins Zorn & Wagner, PC

429 Ne 50Th St, Second Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73105-1815

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Amended Complaint (Re: #23 Amended Complaint) by Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority (Gooch, Ambre) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#24

(#24) ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #23 Amended Complaint) by Sam McCoy, Ronald Spears (Wood, Randall) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

23 #1

Exhibit A

#23

(#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-10, Sam McCoy, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Ronald Spears (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jason William Young (With attachments)(Warren, John) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#22

(#22) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert S. Lafferrandre on behalf of Sam McCoy, Ronald Spears (Lafferrandre, Robert) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#21

(#21) ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White inviting plaintiff to file an amended complaint if he so desires providing additional legal or factual averments which may vitiate defendants' claims of insufficiency no later than 9/9/2020(lal, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#20

(#20) Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Sam McCoy, Ronald Spears Responses due by 9/8/2020(Wood, Randall) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Sam McCoy, Ronald Spears (Wood, Randall) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#18

(#18) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall J. Wood on behalf of Sam McCoy, Ronald Spears (Wood, Randall) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#17

(#17) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority (Gooch, Ambre) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority - Served on 8/3/2020. by Jason William Young (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#8

(#8) ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jason William Young [NOTE: Attorney John W. Warren added to party Jason William Young(pty:pla)]. (Warren, John) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ronald Spears (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Okmulgee Board of County Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sam McCoy (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#2

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Sam McCoy, Ronald Spears (Wood, Randall) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jason William Young (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Amended Complaint (Re: #23 Amended Complaint) by Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority (Gooch, Ambre) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Re: #23 Amended Complaint) by Sam McCoy, Ronald Spears (Wood, Randall) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-10, Sam McCoy, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Ronald Spears (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jason William Young (With attachments)(Warren, John) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert S. Lafferrandre on behalf of Sam McCoy, Ronald Spears (Lafferrandre, Robert) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White inviting plaintiff to file an amended complaint if he so desires providing additional legal or factual averments which may vitiate defendants' claims of insufficiency no later than 9/9/2020(lal, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Sam McCoy, Ronald Spears Responses due by 9/8/2020(Wood, Randall) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Sam McCoy, Ronald Spears (Wood, Randall) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall J. Wood on behalf of Sam McCoy, Ronald Spears (Wood, Randall) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority (Gooch, Ambre) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Partial MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority Responses due by 9/4/2020(Gooch, Ambre) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority - Served on 8/3/2020. by Jason William Young (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jason William Young [NOTE: Attorney John W. Warren added to party Jason William Young(pty:pla)]. (Warren, John) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ronald Spears (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Okmulgee Board of County Commissioners (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Sam McCoy (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/22/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1384221 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jason William Young (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (Filing Fee due by 7/27/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-10, Sam McCoy, Okmulgee Board of County Commissioners, Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority, Ronald Spears by Jason William Young (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jason William Young (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Okmulgee County Criminal Justice Authority is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John William Warren

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald Eugene Smolen, II