This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2020 at 23:09:22 (UTC).

Michael Young v. Mophie, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 Michael Young filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Mophie, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Douglas F. McCormick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00827

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Young

Dan Dolar

Defendant

Mophie, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nona Yegazarian

Attorney at Brown Neri Smith and Khan LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2080

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Nathan M Smith

Attorney at Brown Neri Smith and Khan LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2080

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Eleanor M Drake

Attorney at Berger and Montague PC

43 Se Main Street Suite 505

Minneapolis, MN 55414

Douglas G Blankinship

Attorney at Finkelstein Blankinship Frei-Pearson Garber LLP

445 Hamilton Avenie Suite 605

White Plains, NY 10601

Joseph C Hashmall

Attorney at Berger and Montague PC

43 Se Main Street Suite 505

Minneapolis, MN 55414

E Michelle Drake

43 Se Main Street Suite 505

Minneapolis, MN 55414

Defendant Attorneys

Lyndon R Bradshaw

Attorney at Durham Jones and Pinegar

111 South Main Street Suite 2400

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

David W Tufts

Attorney at Durham Jones and Pinegar

111 South Main Street Suite 2400

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Daniel M Livingston

Attorney at Payne and Fears LLP

4 Park Plaza Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Benjamin A Nix

Attorney at Payne and Fears LLP

4 Park Plaza Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Scott O Luskin

Attorney at Payne and Fears LLP

200 North Pacific Coast Highway Suite 825

El Segundo, CA 90245

 

Court Documents

#76

RESTRICTED

#75

(#75) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Mophie, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Kristin Hughes at khughes@djplaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Tufts, David) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#74

(#74) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Dan Dolar, Michael Young for Court Reporter. Court will contact Eveyn Ozuna at eozuna@fbfglaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Blankinship, Douglas) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#73

(#73) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Motion to Bifurcate Discovery by Judge James V. Selna: For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion. (See order for details.) (es) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#72

(#72) MINUTES OF Defendants Motion to Bifurcate Discovery #64 Hearing held: Motion argued. The Court's tentative as modified in open court shall become the ruling. A separate order to issue. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lb) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#70

(#70) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs Michael Young and Dan Dolar and defendant Mophie, Inc.'s (collectively, the "Parties") request for an adjournment of the court proceeding on the Motion to Bifurcate Discovery (Dkt. No. 67) is GRANTED. The hearing on the motions is now adjourned to December 30, 2019 or January 6, 2020. #69 (es) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

69 #1

Proposed Order

#69

(#69) STIPULATION for Order Requesting Adjournment of Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate Discovery filed by Plaintiff Dan Dolar, Michael Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blankinship, Douglas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#64

(#68) [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery #64 previously set for 12/9/2019 at 1:30 pm is continued to 12/23/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Michael Young. Related Case(s): 30-2019-01066228-CU-BT-CXC (Yegazarian, Nona) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Mophie, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 05/04/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/04/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) (Entered: 05/04/2019)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff Michael Young. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#3

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff Michael Young. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#2

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff Michael Young. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#1

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Mophie, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 05/04/2019)

106 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 1-6-20 2:13 p.m. re Transcript #76 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Seffens, Sharon) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 1-6-20 2:13 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Sharon Seffens, phone number sseffens@earthlink.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 1/29/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2020. (Seffens, Sharon) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Mophie, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Kristin Hughes at khughes@djplaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Tufts, David) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Dan Dolar, Michael Young for Court Reporter. Court will contact Eveyn Ozuna at eozuna@fbfglaw.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Blankinship, Douglas) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Motion to Bifurcate Discovery by Judge James V. Selna: For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion. (See order for details.) (es) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) MINUTES OF Defendants Motion to Bifurcate Discovery #64 Hearing held: Motion argued. The Court's tentative as modified in open court shall become the ruling. A separate order to issue. Court Reporter: Sharon Seffens. (lb) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery #64 previously set for 12/23/2019 at 1:30 pm is continued to 1/6/2020 at 1:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) ORDER by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs Michael Young and Dan Dolar and defendant Mophie, Inc.'s (collectively, the "Parties") request for an adjournment of the court proceeding on the Motion to Bifurcate Discovery (Dkt. No. 67) is GRANTED. The hearing on the motions is now adjourned to December 30, 2019 or January 6, 2020. #69 (es) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) STIPULATION for Order Requesting Adjournment of Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate Discovery filed by Plaintiff Dan Dolar, Michael Young. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blankinship, Douglas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the MOTION to Bifurcate Discovery #64 previously set for 12/9/2019 at 1:30 pm is continued to 12/23/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/22/2019. (lb) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff Michael Young. Related Case(s): 30-2019-01066228-CU-BT-CXC (Yegazarian, Nona) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Mophie, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 05/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) (Entered: 05/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff Michael Young. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Michael Young, identifying Michael Young, Class of similarly situated individuals. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael Young. (Yegazarian, Nona) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23666626 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Michael Young. (Attorney Nona Yegazarian added to party Michael Young(pty:pla))(Yegazarian, Nona) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mophie, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott O Luskin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lyndon Rone Bradshaw(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin A. Nix Esquire