This case was last updated from PACER on 06/21/2020 at 08:59:32 (UTC).

Young v. Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/22/2020 Young filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-00076

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bernice Young

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew S. Bissette

Attorney at Whitley Law Firm

3301 Benson Drive, Suite 120

Raleigh, NC 27609

Defendant Attorneys

Brianna Hawkins Walther

Attorney at Wall Templeton & Haldrup, P.A.

P.O. Box 10937, 1001 Wade Avenue, Suite 423

Raleigh, NC 27605

Marie D. Lang

Attorney at Wall Templeton & Haldrup, P.A.

1001 Wade Avenue, Suite 423, Post Office Box 10937

Raleigh, NC 27605

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance filed by Marie D. Lang on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Lang, Marie) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/8/2021. Mediation Deadline set for 11/30/2020. Motions due by 2/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 5/29/2020. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#10

(#10) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Walther, Brianna) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/13/2020. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#8

(#8) Financial Disclosure Statement by Bernice Young (Bissette, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#7

(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew S. Bissette on behalf of Bernice Young. (Bissette, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#6

(#6) Notice filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet). (Walther, Brianna) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Matthew S. Bissette of WHITLEY LAW FIRM at 3301 Benson Drive, Suite 120, Raleigh, NC 27609 mailed via US Mail on April 24, 2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Plt's Amended Complaint) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Walther, Brianna) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#2

(#2) Financial Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Walther, Brianna) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit E - DOI Company Search

1 #5

Exhibit D - Plt's Voter Registration

1 #4

Exhibit C - Service of Process

1 #3

Exhibit B - Amended Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company from Sampson County Superior Court, case number 20-CvS-292. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5400395), filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Service of Process, #5 Exhibit D - Plt's Voter Registration, #6 Exhibit E - DOI Company Search) (Walther, Brianna) (Attachment 1 flattened and replaced on 4/24/2020) (Edwards, S.). (Entered: 04/22/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance filed by Marie D. Lang on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Lang, Marie) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 6/22/2020. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/8/2021. Mediation Deadline set for 11/30/2020. Motions due by 2/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 5/29/2020. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemark - #10 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank for the entry of a scheduling order. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Walther, Brianna) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/13/2020. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Financial Disclosure Statement by Bernice Young (Bissette, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew S. Bissette on behalf of Bernice Young. (Bissette, Matthew) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet). (Walther, Brianna) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Brianna Hawkins Walther on behalf of Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Walther, Brianna) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Matthew S. Bissette of WHITLEY LAW FIRM at 3301 Benson Drive, Suite 120, Raleigh, NC 27609 mailed via US Mail on April 24, 2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet - Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or flatten the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerks office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the civil cover sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No further action is needed. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Notice of Removal: Counsel has failed to attach the Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet as required by Local Rule 5.3(a). This form can be found on the court's website and can be filed using the event Notice - Other. Counsel should add as attachments any other documents required under Local Rule 5.3(a) that have not already been filed. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Plt's Amended Complaint) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Walther, Brianna) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Walther, Brianna) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company from Sampson County Superior Court, case number 20-CvS-292. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5400395), filed by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Service of Process, #5 Exhibit D - Plt's Voter Registration, #6 Exhibit E - DOI Company Search) (Walther, Brianna) (Attachment 1 flattened and replaced on 4/24/2020) (Edwards, S.). (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less