This case was last updated from PACER on 08/26/2019 at 07:41:50 (UTC).

YOUNG v. HAYES MECHANICAL

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 YOUNG filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against HAYES MECHANICAL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Peter J. Phipps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00762

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Peter J. Phipps

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

. TAMMY YOUNG

TAMMY YOUNG

Defendant

HAYES MECHANICAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael N. Vaporis

840 Philadelphia Street, Suite 301

Indiana, PA 15701

Defendant Attorney

Scott R. Leah

Attorney at Tucker Arensberg

1500 One Ppg Place

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by HAYES MECHANICAL. (Leah, Scott) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Indiana County, case number 11007 CD 2019 Copies attached: State Court Complaint, Affidavit of Service and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5191106), filed by HAYES MECHANICAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (ksa) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 9/4/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 8B before Judge Peter J. Phipps. Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/28/2019, and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 8/30/2019. (atg) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit 3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit 2 Affidavit of Service

#7

(#7) Disclosure Statement identifying Mycenaean Shield, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HAYES MECHANICAL. (Leah, Scott) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • (#8) ORDER directing that, although Judge Peter J. Phipps is no longer the presiding judge of any case pending in this court, the docket in those cases over which he presided will continue to reflect him as the presiding judicial officer until such time as they are reassigned to another judicial officer of this court. Until that time, the Chief Judge or his designee will address any motions or other matters that may require judicial action in those cases; Any inquires regarding these matters shall be directed to Deputy Clerk Beth Abbott at (412) 208-7390. This Order will remain in effect until modified or vacated by further order of court. See order at 2:19-mc-00858. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Disclosure Statement identifying Mycenaean Shield, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HAYES MECHANICAL. (Leah, Scott) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 9/4/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 8B before Judge Peter J. Phipps. Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/28/2019, and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 8/30/2019. (atg) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/15/2019. (av) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by HAYES MECHANICAL. (Leah, Scott) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by TAMMY YOUNG. (Vaporis, Michael) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option by HAYES MECHANICAL. (Leah, Scott) Modified text on 7/3/2019. (eca) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • (#2) ORDER OF COURT. By July 15, 2019, each party must execute and file the judge election form, available at https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Through that filing, each party must either consent to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge or select the option to proceed before a United States District Judge. If all parties consent to have the case assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge, the matter will be referred to the Clerk of Court for reassignment. Signed by Judge Peter J. Phipps on 07/01/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Indiana County, case number 11007 CD 2019 Copies attached: State Court Complaint, Affidavit of Service and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5191106), filed by HAYES MECHANICAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit 3 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (ksa) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.