This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2020 at 09:48:24 (UTC).

Young v. Fox

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 Young filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against Fox. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles C. Lovell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00065

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles C. Lovell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Huguette Nicole Young

Junction City, OR 97448

Defendant

Tim Fox

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Attachment 1

#8

(#8) MOTION TO RECONSIDER PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP GIVEN NEW CIRCUMSTANCES; AND TO COMPEL THE COURT TO HONOR RULE 5.1(b) by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (HEG) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

7 #1

IFP Form

#7

(#7) ORDERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed informa pauperis (Doc. 1) is DENIED without prejudice and with leave to refile. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall either file a completed application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs or pay the full $400 filing fee on or before October 19, 2020. Plaintiff is receiving electronic service and IFP form is attached for filing. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 9/11/2020. (Attachment: #1 IFP Form) (HEG) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#6

(#6) Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail. (HEG) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#5

(#5) Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-mail by Huguette Nicole Young. (HEG) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

3 #2

PRO SE REQUEST TO FILE BY EMAIL

3 #1

NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Young with docket sheet (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE, #2 PRO SE REQUEST TO FILE BY EMAIL) (TAG) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO RECONSIDER PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP GIVEN NEW CIRCUMSTANCES; AND TO COMPEL THE COURT TO HONOR RULE 5.1(b) by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (HEG) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed informa pauperis (Doc. 1) is DENIED without prejudice and with leave to refile. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall either file a completed application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs or pay the full $400 filing fee on or before October 19, 2020. Plaintiff is receiving electronic service and IFP form is attached for filing. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 9/11/2020. (Attachment: #1 IFP Form) (HEG) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail. (HEG) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-mail by Huguette Nicole Young. (HEG) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Huguette Nicole Young. (HEG) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Young with docket sheet (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE, #2 PRO SE REQUEST TO FILE BY EMAIL) (TAG) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less